Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1015273

EP1015273 - AN IMPROVED MOTOR VEHICLE DISPLAY APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.06.2004
Database last updated on 20.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.06.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.08.2004  [2004/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Design Technology & Innovation (Safety) 1994 Limited
Chalvington House Chalvington
Hailsham, East Sussex BN27 3TQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/27]For all designated states
Design Technology & Innovation (Safety) 1994 Limited
Chalvington House
Chalvington, Hailsham, East Sussex BN27 3TQ / GB
Inventor(s)01 / TONKIN, Mark, Christopher
The Barn Ripe Lane Ripe Village
Lewes East Sussex BN8 6AP / GB
[2000/27]
Representative(s)Dearling, Bruce Clive , et al
Hepworth Lawrence Bryer & Bizley, Merlin House, Falconry Court, Bakers Lane
Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/27]Dearling, Bruce Clive , et al
Hepworth Lawrence Bryer & Bizley, Merlin House, Falconry Court, Bakers Lane
Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB
Application number, filing date98949081.825.09.1998
[2000/27]
WO1998GB02906
Priority number, dateGB1997002038926.09.1997         Original published format: GB 9720389
[2000/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9916639
Date:08.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1015273
Date:05.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.1999
[2000/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1015273
Date:20.08.2003
Language:EN
[2003/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.04.1999
ClassificationInternational:B60Q1/44
[2000/27]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   PT,   SE [2003/49]
Former [2003/42]BE,  DE,  ES,  FR,  IT,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Former [2000/27]BE,  DE,  ES,  FR,  GB,  IT,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:VERBESSERTE ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGE[2002/13]
English:AN IMPROVED MOTOR VEHICLE DISPLAY APPARATUS[2000/27]
French:DISPOSITIF INDICATEUR AMELIORE POUR VEHICULE A MOTEUR[2000/27]
Former [2000/27]ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGE
Entry into regional phase11.04.2000National basic fee paid 
11.04.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
11.04.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.04.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/27]
23.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
03.01.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
09.01.2003Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
03.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.05.2003Fee for grant paid
09.05.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.05.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
26.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
26.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9117068  (DONNACHIE ROBERT WILLIAM [GB]) [X] 1-6,8,15,19,21 * figures 1-4; claims 1-8,11 *;
 [A]WO9000991  (TAMAPACK KK [JP]) [A] 1-14 * abstract *;
 [A]DE4003313  (STRAATMAN ERNST [DE]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE19605813  (HEIS RAINER [DE]) [A] 1,6 * abstract *
by applicantEP0680418
 WO9315931
 EP0554924
 US4928084
 US4924207
 US5576668