Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1021816

EP1021816 - ELECTRONIC SWITCH FOR QUICK, AUTOMATIC RESPONSE TO CURRENT OVERLOADS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.12.2006
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 07.01.2009  [2009/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Target Hi-Tech Electronics Ltd.
Haargaman 6, P.O. Box 8011
Netanya 42504 / IL
[2006/02]
Former [2000/30]For all designated states
Target Hi-Tech Electronics Ltd.
Haargaman 6, P.O. Box 8011
Netanya 42504 / IL
Inventor(s)01 / WITTNER, Lupu
Savidor 85B
Netanya / IL
02 / KONSTANTINOVSKY, Eduard
Harav Kook 25/20
42260 Netanya / IL
[2000/30]
Representative(s)McKeown, Yvonne Mary , et al
MacLachlan & Donaldson
2B Clonskeagh Square
Clonskeagh Road
Dublin 14 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2000/30]McKeown, Yvonne Mary , et al
c/o MacLachlan & Donaldson, 47 Merrion Square
Dublin 2 / IE
Application number, filing date98949323.408.09.1998
[2000/30]
WO1998US18668
Priority number, dateUS1997092668610.09.1997         Original published format: US 926686
[2000/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9913483
Date:18.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1021816
Date:26.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.1999
[2000/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1021816
Date:11.01.2006
Language:EN
[2006/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US18.03.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.06.2002
ClassificationInternational:H01H73/00, H01H9/54
[2002/31]
Former International [2000/30]H01H73/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/30]
Extension statesAL28.03.2000
LT28.03.2000
LV28.03.2000
MK28.03.2000
RO28.03.2000
SI28.03.2000
TitleGerman:ELEKTRONISCHER SCHALTER FÜR SCHNELLE AUTOMATISCHE REAKTION AUF ÜBERSTRÖME[2000/30]
English:ELECTRONIC SWITCH FOR QUICK, AUTOMATIC RESPONSE TO CURRENT OVERLOADS[2000/30]
French:COMMUTATEUR ELECTRONIQUE POUR UNE REPONSE RAPIDE ET AUTOMATIQUE AUX SURCHARGES DE COURANT[2000/30]
Entry into regional phase22.03.2000National basic fee paid 
22.03.2000Search fee paid 
22.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
22.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.03.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
22.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/30]
10.02.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.06.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.07.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.10.2005Fee for grant paid
17.10.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.10.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
15.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
02.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
26.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
25.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
07.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT11.01.2006
CY11.01.2006
GR12.04.2006
PT12.06.2006
LU08.09.2006
MC30.09.2006
[2009/02]
Former [2008/36]AT11.01.2006
GR12.04.2006
PT12.06.2006
LU08.09.2006
MC30.09.2006
Former [2008/21]AT11.01.2006
GR12.04.2006
PT12.06.2006
MC30.09.2006
Former [2008/16]AT11.01.2006
PT12.06.2006
MC30.09.2006
Former [2006/49]AT11.01.2006
PT12.06.2006
Former [2006/43]AT11.01.2006
Documents cited:Search[A]US4652962  (HOWELL EDWARD K [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US5528131  (MARTY CHRISTIAN [FR], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *
International search[A]US4420784  (CHEN C GREGORY [US], et al);
 [A]US4532570  (THORNLEY DEREK [GB], et al);
 [A]US5508878  (PECORE RICK A [US]);
 [A]US4772809  (KOGA HIROFUMI [JP], et al);
 [A]US4704652  (BILLINGS WILLIAM W [US]);
 [A]US4992904  (SPENCER WILLIAM M [US], et al)