blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1032268 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1032268



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 110
23.08.2007 Closing of application Search / examination 1
14.05.2007 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
11.12.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
11.12.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.11.2006 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
30.08.2003 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
17.07.2003 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
08.07.2003 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
08.07.2003 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
08.07.2003 European search report Search / examination 1
08.07.2003 Supplemental sheet B (lack of unity of invention) Search / examination 1
08.07.2003 Supplemental sheet D (claims incurring fees) Search / examination 1
26.07.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
11.07.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.07.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
24.06.2000 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
09.06.2000 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
09.06.2000 Invitation to pay fees for entry into European phase Search / examination 2
09.06.2000 Invitation to pay fees for entry into European phase Search / examination 4
07.09.1999 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
18.05.1999 Priority document Search / examination 38
29.03.1999 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
29.03.1999 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 34