blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1032268


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
14.09.2007 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  17.10.2007  [2007/42]
08.05.2007 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
08.12.2006 First examination report
07.12.2006 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
31.10.2006 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
22.09.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.09.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.09.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.07.2003 Supplementary search report published on  20.08.2003  [2003/34]
04.07.2003 Change - classification published on  20.08.2003  [2003/34]
25.09.2002 Renewal fee
19.09.2001 Renewal fee
21.07.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  06.09.2000 [2000/36]
21.07.2000 Request for examination filed published on  06.09.2000 [2000/36]
14.07.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
11.07.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
04.07.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
04.07.2000 Renewal fee
02.06.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
09.11.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
20.04.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
23.11.1998 PCT data prior to European publication