blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP1032268

Designated contracting statesAT 
BE 
CH 
CY 
DE 
DK 
ES 
FI 
FR 
GB 
GR 
IE 
IT 
LI 
LU 
MC 
NL 
PT 
SE 
Examination procedure14.05.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2007/42]
Entry into regional phase24.06.2000National basic fee paid 
24.06.2000Search fee paid 
24.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
24.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
14.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
14.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
09.06.2000AT   M01   Fee paid on   24.06.2000
09.06.2000BE   M01   Fee paid on   24.06.2000
09.06.2000CH   M01   Fee paid on   24.06.2000
09.06.2000CY   M01   Fee paid on   24.06.2000
09.06.2000DE   M01   Fee paid on   24.06.2000
09.06.2000DK   M01   Fee paid on   24.06.2000
09.06.2000ES   M01   Fee paid on   24.06.2000
09.06.2000FI   M01   Fee paid on   24.06.2000
09.06.2000FR   M01   Fee paid on   24.06.2000
09.06.2000GB   M01   Fee paid on   24.06.2000
09.06.2000GR   M01   Fee paid on   24.06.2000
09.06.2000IE   M01   Fee paid on   24.06.2000
09.06.2000IT   M01   Fee paid on   24.06.2000
09.06.2000LU   M01   Fee paid on   24.06.2000
09.06.2000MC   M01   Fee paid on   24.06.2000
09.06.2000NL   M01   Fee paid on   24.06.2000
09.06.2000PT   M01   Fee paid on   24.06.2000
09.06.2000SE   M01   Fee paid on   24.06.2000
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
09.06.2000M01   Fee paid on   24.06.2000
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200609   M06   Not yet paid
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:06.09.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:06.09.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20000624
 
Event date:20.08.2003 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:7A 01N 63/00 A
 
Event date:20.08.2003 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:7C 07C 315/00 B
 
Event date:20.08.2003 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:7A 61K 35/18 B
 
Event date:20.08.2003 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:7C 12N 5/06 B
 
Event date:20.08.2003 
Event description:SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20030708
 
Event date:10.01.2007 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20061211
 
Event date:17.10.2007 
Event description:APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20070401