Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1032268

EP1032268 - REDUCED ANTIGENIC CELLS AND USES THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.09.2007
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.10.2007  [2007/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE UAB RESEARCH FOUNDATION
Suite 1120G-AB, 701 South 20th Street
Birmingham, AL 35294-0111 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/36]For all designated states
THE UAB RESEARCH FOUNDATION
Suite 1120G-AB, 701 South 20th Street
Birmingham, AL 35294-0111 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HUANG, Shu, T.
2607 Foothills Drive
Birmingham, AL 35226 / US
02 / HORTIN, Glen, L.
14309 Cartwright Way
North Potomac, MD 20878 / US
[2000/36]
Representative(s)Wilkinson, Stephen John
Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins
1 St. Augustine's Place
Bristol BS1 4UD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/36]Wilkinson, Stephen John
Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 St. Augustine's Place
Bristol BS1 4UD / GB
Application number, filing date98949463.824.09.1998
[2000/36]
WO1998US19972
Priority number, dateUS1997006023526.09.1997         Original published format: US 60235
[2000/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9916318
Date:08.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1032268
Date:06.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.1999
[2000/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US08.04.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.07.2003
ClassificationInternational:A01N63/00, C07C315/00, A61K35/18, C12N5/06
[2003/34]
Former International [2000/36]A01N63/00, C07C315/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/36]
TitleGerman:REDUZIERTE ANTIGENZELLEN UND IHRE VERWENDUNG[2000/36]
English:REDUCED ANTIGENIC CELLS AND USES THEREFOR[2000/36]
French:CELLULE ANTIGENE REDUITE ET SES UTILISATIONS[2000/36]
Entry into regional phase24.06.2000National basic fee paid 
24.06.2000Search fee paid 
24.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
24.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.04.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
24.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
11.12.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.04.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/42]
14.05.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2007/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
14.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
14.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
09.06.2000AT   M01   Fee paid on   24.06.2000
09.06.2000BE   M01   Fee paid on   24.06.2000
09.06.2000CH   M01   Fee paid on   24.06.2000
09.06.2000CY   M01   Fee paid on   24.06.2000
09.06.2000DE   M01   Fee paid on   24.06.2000
09.06.2000DK   M01   Fee paid on   24.06.2000
09.06.2000ES   M01   Fee paid on   24.06.2000
09.06.2000FI   M01   Fee paid on   24.06.2000
09.06.2000FR   M01   Fee paid on   24.06.2000
09.06.2000GB   M01   Fee paid on   24.06.2000
09.06.2000GR   M01   Fee paid on   24.06.2000
09.06.2000IE   M01   Fee paid on   24.06.2000
09.06.2000IT   M01   Fee paid on   24.06.2000
09.06.2000LU   M01   Fee paid on   24.06.2000
09.06.2000MC   M01   Fee paid on   24.06.2000
09.06.2000NL   M01   Fee paid on   24.06.2000
09.06.2000PT   M01   Fee paid on   24.06.2000
09.06.2000SE   M01   Fee paid on   24.06.2000
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
09.06.2000M01   Fee paid on   24.06.2000
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200609   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9728254  (BIOMED FRONTIERS INC [US], et al) [X] 13 * page 14, line 14 * * page 12, line 5 - page 13, line 14 *;
 [X]  - JEONG S T ET AL, "DECREASED AGGLUTINABILITY OF METHOXY-POLYETHYLENE GLYCOL ATTACHED RED BLOOD CELLS: SIGNIFICANCE AS A BLOOD SUBSTITUTE", ARTIFICIAL CELLS, BLOOD SUBSTITUTES, AND IMMOBILIZATION BIOTECHNOLOGY, MARCEL DEKKER INC, US, (1996), vol. 24, no. 5, ISSN 1073-1199, pages 503 - 511, XP000673685 [X] 1-12,14-19 * abstract * * page 505, paragraph 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.3109/10731199609117442
 [A]  - HORTIN GLEN L ET AL, "Progress toward preparation of universal donor red cells.", ARTIFICIAL CELLS BLOOD SUBSTITUTES AND IMMOBILIZATION BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1997), vol. 25, no. 5, ISSN 1073-1199, pages 487 - 491, XP001147662 [A] 1-19 * abstract * * page 488, paragraphs 3,5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.3109/10731199709118939
International search[Y]US5498421  (GRINSTAFF MARK W [US], et al);
 [Y]US5171264  (MERRILL EDWARD W [US]);
 [Y]US4766106  (KATRE NANDINI [US], et al);
 [Y]  - HORTIN G. L., HUANG S. T., "SURFACE-PEGYLATED RED CELLS AS POTENTIAL UNIVERSAL DONOR RED CELLS.", Blood, American Society of Hematology, US, US, (19961115), vol. 88., no. 10., ISSN 0006-4971, page 181A., XP002915145
 [Y]  - MURAD K., ET AL., "MOLECULAR CAMOUFLAGE OF ANTIGENIC DETERMINANTS ON INTACT MAMMALIAN CELLS: POSSIBLE APPLICATIONS TO TRANSFUSION MEDICINE.", Blood, American Society of Hematology, US, US, (19961115), vol. 88., no. 10., ISSN 0006-4971, page 444A., XP002915146
 [Y]  - SCOTT M. D., ET AL., "CHEMICAL CAMOUFLAGE OF ANTIGENIC DETERMINANTS: STEALTH ERYTHROCYTES", Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences, National Academy of Sciences, US, US, (19970701), vol. 94., doi:10.1073/pnas.94.14.7566, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 7566 - 7571., XP002915147

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.94.14.7566
 [ET]  - "INTRODUCTION TO SHEARWATER POLYMERS.", POLY(ETHYLENE GLYCOL) CHEMISTRY: BIOTECHNICAL AND BIOMEDICALAPPLICATIONS, XX, XX, XX, (19981125), page COMPLETE 04., XP002915148
 [A]  - GRAHAM N. B., "POLY(ETHYLENE GLYCOL) GELS AND DRUG DELIVERY.", POLY(ETHYLENE GLYCOL) CHEMISTRY: BIOTECHNICAL AND BIOMEDICALAPPLICATIONS, XX, XX, XX, (19920101), pages 263 - 281., XP002915149
 [A]  - HARRIS J. M., ET AL., "SYNTHESIS OF NEW POLY(ETHYLENE GLYCOL) DERIVATIVES.", POLY(ETHYLENE GLYCOL) CHEMISTRY: BIOTECHNICAL AND BIOMEDICALAPPLICATIONS, XX, XX, XX, (19920101), pages 371 - 381., XP002915150
 [A]  - SEHON A. H., "SUPPRESSION OF ANTIBODY RESPONSES BY CONJUGATES OF ANTIGENS AND MONOMETHOXYPOLY(ETHYLENE GLYCOL).", POLY(ETHYLENE GLYCOL) CHEMISTRY: BIOTECHNICAL AND BIOMEDICALAPPLICATIONS, XX, XX, XX, (19920101), pages 139 - 151., XP002915151