blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1015306 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1015306



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 97
05.03.2003 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
13.02.2003 Final instructions (application deemed to be withdrawn/application refused) Search / examination 1
05.11.2002 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
29.10.2002 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no declaration of maintenance of the application/non-reply to the Written Opinion) Search / examination 1
03.07.2002 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
26.06.2002 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
26.06.2002 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
26.06.2002 European search report Search / examination 1
28.06.2000 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
20.06.2000 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 5
20.06.2000 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 5
13.06.2000 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
24.05.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
23.05.2000 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
09.05.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.04.2000 Claims Search / examination 3
22.04.2000 Description Search / examination 4
22.04.2000 Drawings Search / examination 2
22.04.2000 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
20.04.2000 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
20.04.2000 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 9
11.05.1999 Priority document Search / examination 8
19.04.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
22.03.1999 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
22.03.1999 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 30