Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1015306

EP1015306 - DUCTED TURBINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.02.2003
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.04.2003  [2003/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fosdick Hi-Tek Wind Turbine Inc.
14 Wellington Drive
Stony Brook, NY 11790 / US
[2000/27]
Inventor(s)01 / FOSDICK, George
21 Mill Street
Port Jefferson, New York 11776 / US
[2000/36]
Former [2000/27]01 / FOSDICK, George
14 Wellington Drive
Stony Brook, NY 11790 / US
Representative(s)Schippan, Ralph , et al
Cohausz & Florack
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstrasse 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/27]Schippan, Ralph, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Cohausz & Florack, Kanzlerstrasse 8a
40472 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date98949489.324.09.1998
[2000/27]
WO1998US20058
Priority number, dateUS19970059830P24.09.1997         Original published format: US 59830 P
[2000/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9915398
Date:01.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1015306
Date:05.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.1999
[2000/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US01.04.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.06.2002
ClassificationInternational:B63H1/28, B63H7/02, B65H1/14, B65H7/02, B64C11/16, B64C27/46, F01D5/00, F03B3/12, F03D1/06
[2000/27]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/27]
Extension statesAL20.04.2000
LT20.04.2000
LV20.04.2000
MK20.04.2000
RO20.04.2000
SI20.04.2000
TitleGerman:TURBINE MIT ZEMTRALEM KANAL[2000/27]
English:DUCTED TURBINE[2000/27]
French:TURBINE A CONDUIT[2000/27]
Entry into regional phase20.04.2000National basic fee paid 
20.04.2000Search fee paid 
20.04.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
20.04.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.04.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
20.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/27]
04.09.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/14]
29.10.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
14.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200205   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE4414208  (SCHUBERT WERNER [DE]) [X] 1-7,9 * figure - * [Y] 8,10;
 [Y]FR2283331  (HAINAULT PAUL [FR]) [Y] 8,10 * figure - *;
 [X]FR1038090  (MILIET GEORGES-JEAN) [X] 1-3,7,9 * figure - *;
 [X]US4159191  (GRAYBILL CLINTON L [US]) [X] 1,3,7 * figure - *;
 [X]DE4323132  (TEPE WALTER PROF DR [DE]) [X] 1-7,9 * figure - *;
 [DA]US4427343  (FOSDICK GEORGE [US]) [DA] 1-10 * figure - *
International search[X]US3071194  (GESKE WILLIAM C);
 [XP]US5800123  (TRAVOR BRUCE W [US]);
 [A]US4427343  (FOSDICK GEORGE [US]);
 [A]US3883264  (RAO GADICHERLA V R);
 [A]US4159191  (GRAYBILL CLINTON L [US]);
 [A]US949150  (KESTNER PAUL [FR]);
 [A]US4086026  (TAMANINI ROBERT J);
 [X]US4778419  (BOLLE ROBERT [BE], et al)
by applicantUS4427343