EP1032879 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONTROLLING ACCESS TO CONFIDENTIAL DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.06.2004 [2004/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hughes Electronics Corporation Bldg. 001, MS A109 P.O. Box 956 200 North Sepulveda Boulevard El Segundo California 90245-0956 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/36] | For all designated states Hughes Electronics Corporation Bldg. 001, MS A109 P.O. Box 956 200 North Sepulveda Boulevard El Segundo, California 90245-0956 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CASSAGNOL, Robert, D. 1904 Alabaster Drive Silver Spring, MD 20904 / US | 02 /
DILLON, Douglas, M. 1 Bell Bluff Court Gaithersburg, MD 20879 / US | 03 /
KLOPER, David, S. 1012 Leafy Hollow Circle Mt. Airy, MD 21771 / US | 04 /
WEBER, Sandra, J. 1431 Brookline Boulevard Pittsburgh, PA 15226 / US | 05 /
BAUTZ, Brandon, E. 9803 Bristol Square Lane Bethesda, MD 20814 / US | [2000/36] | Representative(s) | Lindner, Michael, et al Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/36] | Lindner, Michael, Dipl.-Ing., et al Witte, Weller & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 105462 70047 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 98949515.5 | 25.09.1998 | [2000/36] | WO1998US20122 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0019322 | Date: | 06.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1032879 | Date: | 06.09.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/14 | [2000/36] | CPC: |
G06F21/79 (EP);
G06F21/62 (EP);
G06F2211/007 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/36] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND GERÄT, UM ZUGANG ZU VERTRAULICHEN DATEN ZU KONTROLLIEREN | [2000/36] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONTROLLING ACCESS TO CONFIDENTIAL DATA | [2000/36] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR CONTROLER L'ACCES A DES DONNEES CONFIDENTIELLES | [2000/36] | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/36] | 26.04.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4734568 (WATANABE HIROSHI) [X] 1-14,17,18,20-22,26,28,30,34,35,38,40,42-48 * figures 2-5 * * column 2, line 66 - column 4, line 34 * * column 4, line 67 - column 5, line 57 *; | [AX]US5432950 (SIBIGTROTH JAMES M) [A] 1,2,4-7,9-11,17,20-22,26,28 * figures 1,3-5 * * column 2, line 57 - column 4, line 39 * * column 7, line 46 - column 10, line 28 * [X] 30-40,42-48 |