Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1023377

EP1023377 - STABILIZED POLYETHER POLYOL AND POLYURETHANE FOAM OBTAINED THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.10.2004
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
UNIROYAL CHEMICAL COMPANY, Inc.
World Headquarters Middlebury
Connecticut 06749 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/31]For all designated states
UNIROYAL CHEMICAL COMPANY, Inc.
World Headquarters
Middlebury Connecticut 06749 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CALABRESE, Ronald, A.
501 Route 80
Guilford, CT 06437 / US
02 / BOCCUZZI, Rosemarie, A.
P.O. Box 432
Middlebury, CT 06762 / US
[2000/31]
Representative(s)Spott, Gottfried
Spott & Weinmiller
Patentanwälte
Fasanenstrasse 159
82008 Unterhaching / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/31]Spott, Gottfried, Dr.
Spott & Weinmiller Patentanwälte Sendlinger-Tor-Platz 11
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date98949599.929.09.1998
[2000/31]
WO1998US20349
Priority number, dateUS19970060568P30.09.1997         Original published format: US 60568 P
[2000/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9916821
Date:08.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1023377
Date:02.08.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.1999
[2000/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1023377
Date:03.12.2003
Language:EN
[2003/49]
Search report(s)International search reportEP08.04.1999
ClassificationInternational:C08K5/134
[2000/31]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/31]
TitleGerman:STABILISIERTER POLYETHER UND DARAUS HERGESTELLTER POLYURETHANSCHAUMSTOFF[2000/31]
English:STABILIZED POLYETHER POLYOL AND POLYURETHANE FOAM OBTAINED THEREFROM[2000/31]
French:POLYOL DE POLYETHER STABILISE ET MOUSSE DE POLYURETHANNE OBTENUE A PARTIR DE CE POLYOL[2000/31]
Entry into regional phase14.02.2000National basic fee paid 
14.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
14.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.03.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/31]
05.07.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
05.03.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.06.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.10.2003Fee for grant paid
06.10.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.09.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
24.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
23.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
24.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT03.12.2003
CY03.12.2003
FI03.12.2003
DK03.03.2004
GR03.03.2004
SE03.03.2004
PT03.05.2004
[2008/16]
Former [2007/18]AT03.12.2003
CY03.12.2003
FI03.12.2003
DK03.03.2004
GR03.03.2004
SE03.03.2004
Former [2005/02]AT03.12.2003
FI03.12.2003
DK03.03.2004
GR03.03.2004
SE03.03.2004
Former [2004/33]AT03.12.2003
FI03.12.2003
GR03.03.2004
SE03.03.2004
Former [2004/31]AT03.12.2003
FI03.12.2003
SE03.03.2004
Former [2004/26]FI03.12.2003
SE03.03.2004
Former [2004/24]SE03.03.2004
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9422945  (UNIROYAL CHEM CO INC [US]) [A] 1-14 * examples 1,3-7; claims 1,2,9 *;
 [A]US4444676  (STATTON GARY L [US], et al) [A] 1-5,9-14 * claims 1,2,7 *;
 [X]JPS51117750
 [X]  - 1, vol. 76, no. 48, Database accession no. 76-89721X, XP002090180 [X] 15 * abstract *