Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1023349

EP1023349 - REACTIVE EXTRUSION OF TAILORED LIQUID POLYMERS (TLPS) [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.09.2001
Database last updated on 22.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.10.2008Change - representativepublished on 12.11.2008  [2008/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY
2030 Dow Center
Midland, Michigan 48674 / US
[2000/31]
Inventor(s)01 / VAN DER WAL, Hanno, R.
Kreeksingel 4
NL-4542 BP Hoek / NL
02 / ELWELL, Michael, J.
Emmausstraat 29
NL-4515 ED IJzendijke / NL
03 / SCHROCK, Alan, K.
97 Rosewood
Lake Jackson, TX 77566 / US
04 / GRUENBAUER, Henri, J., M.
Schorpioen 45
NL-4501 HC Oostburg / NL
05 / WHITE, Douglas, P.
104 Sandlewood
Lake Jackson, TX 77566 / US
06 / SONNENSCHEIN, Mark, F.
6019 Stonehaven Court
Midland, MI 48640 / US
07 / WEBB, Steven, P.
2014 West Sugnet Road
Midland, MI 48640 / US
[2000/31]
Representative(s)Weiss, Wolfgang , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Postfach 860 820
81635 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/46]Weiss, Wolfgang , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20
81635 München / DE
Former [2001/41]Weiss, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Chem. Dr. , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20
81635 München / DE
Former [2000/31]Weickmann, Heinrich , et al
Weickmann-Fincke-Huber-Liska-Prechtel, Postfach 860820, Kopernikusstr. 9
81635 München / DE
Application number, filing date98949601.329.09.1998
[2000/31]
WO1998US20351
Priority number, dateUS19970060718P01.10.1997         Original published format: US 60718 P
[2000/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9916806
Date:08.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1023349
Date:02.08.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.1999
[2000/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.04.1999
ClassificationInternational:C08G18/10, C08G18/08
[2000/31]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/31]
TitleGerman:REAKTIVE EXTRUSION VON MASSGESCHNEIDERTEN FLÜSSIGEN POLYMEREN[2000/31]
English:REACTIVE EXTRUSION OF TAILORED LIQUID POLYMERS (TLPS)[2000/31]
French:EXTRUSION REACTIVE DE POLYMERES LIQUIDES POUVANT ETRE FA ONNES SUR MESURE[2000/31]
Entry into regional phase02.05.2000National basic fee paid 
02.05.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
02.05.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.03.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/31]
04.10.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.04.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/44]
22.05.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2001/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0571828  (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1-4,13-15,17-19 * claims 1,4,6 *;
 [A]WO9415985  (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [A] 1-3 * claims 5,9 *;
 [A]WO9305109  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1-3,6-8 * example 1; claims 1,3 *;
 [A]EP0554719  (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1-5,13-15,17-19 * example 2; claims 1,12 *