Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1019140

EP1019140 - BALLOON CATHETERIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.12.2004
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 29.10.2008  [2008/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Boston Scientific Limited
The Corporate Centre, Bush Hill, Bay Street St. Michael
Barbados, West Indies / BB
[N/P]
Former [2004/09]For all designated states
Boston Scientific Limited
The Corporate Centre, Bush Hill, Bay Street
St. Michael, Barbados, West Indies / BB
Former [2000/29]For all designated states
BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION
One Boston Scientific Place
Natick, MA 01760-1537 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CAMPBELL, Andrew, J.
253 Franklin Street
Reading, MA 01867 / US
[2000/29]
Representative(s)Lucking, David John
Boehmert & Boehmert
Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/44]Lucking, David John
Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Former [2000/29]Lucking, David John
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38
80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date98949712.802.10.1998
[2000/29]
WO1998US20710
Priority number, dateUS1997094390403.10.1997         Original published format: US 943904
[2000/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9917832
Date:15.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1019140
Date:19.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.1999
[2000/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1019140
Date:11.02.2004
Language:EN
[2004/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US15.04.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61M29/00, A61M25/10
[2000/52]
Former International [2000/29]A61M29/00
Designated contracting statesFR,   NL [2000/29]
TitleGerman:BALLONKATHETERISIERUNG[2000/29]
English:BALLOON CATHETERIZATION[2000/29]
French:CATHETERISATION A BALLONNET[2000/29]
Entry into regional phase29.03.2000National basic fee paid 
29.03.2000Search fee paid 
29.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
29.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.04.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
29.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/29]
15.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.10.2003Fee for grant paid
24.10.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.11.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
08.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
07.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
06.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]US4819751  (SHIMADA LYNN M [US], et al) [A] 1-4,10-12,19,20,23-26 * column 3, line 4 - column 4, line 58; figures 1-6 *;
 [A]US5484409  (ATKINSON ROBERT [US], et al) [A] 1-9,23-26 * column 7, line 5 - line 36 * * column 9, line 30 - line 64; figures 2-4 *
International search[X]US5087246  (SMITH CHARLES E [US])