Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1032269

EP1032269 - TREATMENT OF NEOPLASMS WITH INTERFERON-SENSITIVE, CLONAL VIRUSES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/36]TREATMENT OF NEOPLASMS WITH VIRUSES
[2007/02]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  29.05.2015
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 19.08.2015  [2015/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wellstat Biologics Corporation
930 Clopper Road
Gaithersburg, MD 20878 / US
[2002/45]
Former [2000/36]For all designated states
Pro-Virus, Inc.
16020 Industrial Drive
Gaithersburg, MD 20877 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ROBERTS, Michael, S.
105 Colony Court
Walkersville, MD 21793 / US
02 / LORENCE, Robert, M.
9506 Nowell Drive
Bethesda, MD 20817 / US
03 / GROENE, William, S.
5746 Windsong Court
New Market, MD 21774 / US
04 / RABIN, Harvey
11021 Ralston Road
Rockville, MD 20852 / US
05 / VON BORSTEL, Reid, W.
8310 Fox Run
Potomac, MD 20854 / US
[2000/36]
Representative(s)MacLean, Martin Robert , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/46]MacLean, Martin Robert , et al
Mathys & Squire 100 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8AL / GB
Former [2000/36]Schlich, George William , et al
Mathys & Squire 100 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8AL / GB
Application number, filing date98949797.909.10.1998
[2000/36]
WO1998US21230
Priority number, dateUS1997094824409.10.1997         Original published format: US 948244
[2000/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9918799
Date:22.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1032269
Date:06.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.1999
[2000/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1032269
Date:29.08.2007
Language:EN
[2007/35]
Search report(s)International search reportUS22.04.1999
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP07.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:A01N63/00, A61K35/76, C12N7/00, C12N7/02
[2001/20]
Former International [2000/36]A01N63/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/36]
TitleGerman:BEHANDLUNG VON NEOPLASMEN MIT INTERFERON-EMPFINDLICHEN, KLONALEN VIREN[2007/02]
English:TREATMENT OF NEOPLASMS WITH INTERFERON-SENSITIVE, CLONAL VIRUSES[2007/02]
French:TRAITEMENT DE NEOPLASMES PAR DES VIRUS CLONÉS SENSIBLES A L'INTERFERON[2007/02]
Former [2000/36]BEHANDLUNG VON NEOPLASMEN MIT VIREN
Former [2000/36]TREATMENT OF NEOPLASMS WITH VIRUSES
Former [2000/36]TRAITEMENT DE NEOPLASMES PAR DES VIRUS
Entry into regional phase08.05.2000National basic fee paid 
08.05.2000Search fee paid 
08.05.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
08.05.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.05.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
08.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
26.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.01.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.11.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
24.11.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.12.2006Observations by third parties
23.02.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.06.2007Fee for grant paid
22.06.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP07016086.6  / EP1905304
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  29.05.2008  18.06.2008  ADMISSIBLE
Bayer Pharma Aktiengesellschaft
Müllerstrasse 178
13353 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Weiss, Wolfgang, et al
Weickmann & Weickmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Richard-Strauss-Strasse 80
81679 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2011/38]
Opponent(s)01  29.05.2008  18.06.2008  ADMISSIBLE
Bayer Pharma Aktiengesellschaft
Müllerstrasse 178
13353 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Weiss, Wolfgang, et al
Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Richard-Strauss-Strasse 80
81679 München / DE
Former [2008/28]
Opponent(s)01  29.05.2008   
Bayer Schering Pharma Aktiengesellschaft
Müllerstrasse 178
13353 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Weiss, Wolfgang, et al
Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Kopernikusstrasse 9
81679 München / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
03.07.2008Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
22.12.2008Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
11.03.2010Date of oral proceedings
19.04.2010Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
19.04.2010Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
11.12.2014Legal effect of revocation of patent [ N /P ]
11.12.2014Legal effect of revocation of patent [2015/27]
07.05.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition07.05.2010Appeal received No.  T0995/10
02.08.2010Statement of grounds filed
11.12.2014Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
11.12.2014Date of oral proceedings
17.12.2014Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
08.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
07.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
06.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
25.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
27.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
27.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH29.08.2007
CY29.08.2007
DK29.08.2007
FI29.08.2007
LI29.08.2007
MC31.10.2007
SE29.11.2007
GR30.11.2007
PT29.01.2008
AT09.10.2012
IE09.10.2013
IT09.10.2013
LU09.10.2013
ES10.10.2013
BE31.10.2013
NL01.05.2014
[2015/34]
Former [2015/33]CH29.08.2007
CY29.08.2007
DK29.08.2007
FI29.08.2007
LI29.08.2007
MC31.10.2007
SE29.11.2007
GR30.11.2007
PT29.01.2008
AT09.10.2012
IE09.10.2013
IT09.10.2013
ES10.10.2013
BE31.10.2013
NL01.05.2014
Former [2015/10]CY29.08.2007
DK29.08.2007
FI29.08.2007
MC31.10.2007
SE29.11.2007
GR30.11.2007
PT29.01.2008
AT09.10.2012
IE09.10.2013
IT09.10.2013
ES10.10.2013
BE31.10.2013
NL01.05.2014
Former [2014/48]CY29.08.2007
DK29.08.2007
FI29.08.2007
MC31.10.2007
SE29.11.2007
GR30.11.2007
PT29.01.2008
AT09.10.2012
IE09.10.2013
IT09.10.2013
BE31.10.2013
NL01.05.2014
Former [2014/41]CY29.08.2007
DK29.08.2007
FI29.08.2007
MC31.10.2007
SE29.11.2007
GR30.11.2007
PT29.01.2008
AT09.10.2012
IT09.10.2013
BE31.10.2013
NL01.05.2014
Former [2014/39]CY29.08.2007
DK29.08.2007
FI29.08.2007
MC31.10.2007
SE29.11.2007
GR30.11.2007
PT29.01.2008
AT09.10.2012
IT09.10.2013
NL01.05.2014
Former [2014/38]CY29.08.2007
DK29.08.2007
FI29.08.2007
MC31.10.2007
SE29.11.2007
GR30.11.2007
PT29.01.2008
AT09.10.2012
IT09.10.2013
Former [2013/36]CY29.08.2007
DK29.08.2007
FI29.08.2007
MC31.10.2007
SE29.11.2007
GR30.11.2007
PT29.01.2008
AT09.10.2012
Former [2010/06]CY29.08.2007
DK29.08.2007
FI29.08.2007
MC31.10.2007
SE29.11.2007
GR30.11.2007
PT29.01.2008
Former [2008/28]DK29.08.2007
FI29.08.2007
MC31.10.2007
SE29.11.2007
GR30.11.2007
PT29.01.2008
Former [2008/26]DK29.08.2007
FI29.08.2007
MC31.10.2007
GR30.11.2007
PT29.01.2008
Former [2008/23]DK29.08.2007
FI29.08.2007
GR30.11.2007
Former [2008/21]FI29.08.2007
GR30.11.2007
Former [2008/16]FI29.08.2007
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9626285  (UNIV PENNSYLVANIA [US], et al) [X] 38 * page 3, line 26 - page 4, line 10; claims 1-4 *;
 [X]WO9419022  (PASTEUR INSTITUT [FR], et al) [X] 1-3,17,38,40 * page 4, line 24 - page 5, line 29 *;
 [X]  - SINKOVICS J. ET AL, "New developments in the virus therapy of cancer: A historical review.", INTERVIROLOGY, (1993) 36/4 (193-214)., XP000982845 [X] 1-16,25-36,59,62-68 * abstract * * page 194, column L, paragraph 2 - page 195, column R, paragraph 1 * * page 196, column R, paragraph 2 - page 198, column L, paragraph 3 * * page 202, column L, paragraph 3 * * page 206, column R, paragraph 3 - page 207, column L, paragraph 1 *
 [X]  - HORVATH J ET AL, "Comparison of oncolytic Newcastle disease virus strains.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH ANNUAL, Eighty-sixth Annual Meeting of the American Association for Cancer Research;Toronto, Ontario, Canada; March 18-22, 1995, 1995, (1995), vol. 36, ISSN 0197-016X, page 439, XP002164069 [X] 1-16,25-36,59,62-68 * the whole document *
 [DX]  - RESTIFO N P ET AL, "A NONIMMUNOGENIC SARCOMA TRANSDUCED WITH THE CDNA FOR INTERFERON GAMMA ELICITS CD8-POSITIVE T CELLS AGAINST THE WILD-TYPE TUMOR CORRELATION WITH ANTIGEN PRESENTATION CAPABILITY", JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE, (1992), vol. 175, no. 6, ISSN 0022-1007, pages 1423 - 1431, XP000990661 [DX] 1-3,17 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.175.6.1423
 [DX]  - BEATTIE ELIZABETH ET AL, "Host-range restriction of vaccinia virus E3L-specific deletion mutants.", VIRUS GENES, (1996), vol. 12, no. 1, ISSN 0920-8569, pages 89 - 94, XP000990662 [DX] 37 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00370005
 [DA]  - ARROYO P J ET AL, "ACTIVE SPECIFIC IMMUNOTHERAPY WITH VACCINIA COLON ONCOLYSATE ENHANCES THE IMMUNOMODULATORY AND ANTITUMOR EFFECTS OF INTERLEUKIN-2 AND INTERFERON ALPHA IN A MURINE HEPATIC METASTASIS MODEL", CANCER IMMUNOLOGY IMMUNOTHERAPY, (1990), vol. 31, no. 5, ISSN 0340-7004, pages 305 - 311, XP000990671 [DA] * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01740939
 [A]  - YU ZHONG ET AL, "Antiviral action of interferon-beta on Newcastle disease virus: Selectivity to the hemagglutinin-neuraminidase gene expression.", MEDICAL MICROBIOLOGY AND IMMUNOLOGY, (1995), vol. 184, no. 1, ISSN 0300-8584, pages 45 - 52, XP000990658 [A] * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00216789
International search[X]CN1054192  ;
 [X]  - DATABASE STN CAPLUS, Database accession no. 1992-104333, XP002915850
 [X]  - GRESSER, ET AL., "EXOGENOUS INTERFERON AND INDUCERS OF INTERFERON IN THE TREATMENT OFBALB/C MICE INOCULATED WITH RC19 TUMOUR CELLS", NATURE, Nature Publishing Group, United Kingdom, United Kingdom, (19690823), vol. 223, doi:10.1038/223844a0, ISSN 0028-0836, page 844/845, XP002915851

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/223844a0
otherWO9600007
    - CHOU J. ET AL, "Association of Mr 90,000 phosphoprotein with protein kinase PKR in cells exhibiting enhanced phosphorylation of translation initiation factor eIF-2alhpa and premature shutoff of protein synthesis after infection with gamma134.5- mutants of herpes simplex virus 1", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. BIOCHEMISTRY, (199511), vol. 92, pages 10516 - 10520, XP003000620

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.92.23.10516