EP1030746 - PRECISION-ROLLING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.2003 [2003/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOEST-ALPINE Industrieanlagenbau GmbH Turmstrasse 44 4020 Linz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/35] | For all designated states VOEST-ALPINE INDUSTRIEANLAGENBAU GMBH Turmstrasse 44 4020 Linz / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEIN, Gerald Schlühslmayrstrasse 89 A-4400 Steyr / AT | [2000/35] | Representative(s) | VA TECH Patente GmbH & Co Wolfgang-Pauli-Strasse 2 4020 Linz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/17] | VA TECH Patente GmbH Stahlstrasse 21 a 4020 Linz / AT | ||
Former [2001/12] | VA TECH Patente GmbH Serravagasse 10 1140 Wien / AT | ||
Former [2000/35] | Rieberer, Stefan, Dipl.-Ing. VA TECH Patente GmbH, Stahlstrasse 21a 4020 Linz / AT | Application number, filing date | 98949818.3 | 21.10.1998 | [2000/35] | WO1998AT00255 | Priority number, date | AT19970001932 | 14.11.1997 Original published format: AT 193297 | [2000/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9925499 | Date: | 27.05.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1030746 | Date: | 30.08.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1030746 | Date: | 08.05.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B21B1/18, B21B13/10, B21B39/14 | [2000/35] | CPC: |
B21B39/14 (EP,US);
B21B1/18 (EP,US);
B21B13/103 (EP,US);
B21B2031/026 (EP,US);
B21B31/04 (EP,US);
B21B31/103 (EP,US);
B21B35/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, SE [2001/42] |
Former [2000/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | PRÄZISIONSWALZVERFAHREN | [2000/35] | English: | PRECISION-ROLLING METHOD | [2000/35] | French: | PROCEDE DE LAMINAGE DE PRECISION | [2000/35] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/35] | 02.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS57165101 ; | [A]FR1213692 (MOELLER & NEUMANN GMBH) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]DE1527730 (UNITED STATES STEEL CORP) [A] 1,3,5-7 * page 5 - page 9; figure - *; | [A]US3513697 (THAYER FREDERICK L) [A] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [A]US3575028 (EIBE WERNER W); | [A]GB1268213 (THAELMANN SCHWERMASCHBAU VEB [DE]); | [YA]DE2437545 (COPPER REFINERIES PTY LTD) [Y] 1-5,7,14 * page 10 - page 14; figure - * [A] 6; | [DYA]EP0264849 (SCHLOEMANN SIEMAG AG [DE]) [DY] 1-5,7,14 * column 2 - column 4; figures 1,2 * [A] 6; | [A]EP0549896 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO [JP], et al) [A] 1,3,7 * page 3 - page 8; figures 1-10C *; | [A]EP0560115 (SCHLOEMANN SIEMAG AG [DE]) [A] 1,3,6 * column 2 - column 4; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0720875 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO [JP]) [A] 1,3,7,10,14 * page 2 - page 6; figures 1-4,8 *; | [A]DE19625811 (SCHLOEMANN SIEMAG AG [DE]) [A] 1,3 * column 2 - column 3; figures 1,4-7 *; | [A]EP0776709 (DAIDO STEEL CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-4,7,8 * column 5 - column 8; figures 1-6 *; | [A] - YAMANAKA E ET AL, "DEVELOPMENT OF 4-ROLL SIZE-FREE ROLLING TECHNOLOGY FOR BAR MILL", CAHIERS D'INFORMATIONS TECHNIQUES DE LA REVUE DE METALLURGIE, (19960301), vol. 93, no. 3, pages 427 - 438, XP000587318 [A] 1,3,5,7,10-12 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830111), vol. 007, no. 005, Database accession no. (M - 184), & JP57165101 A 19821012 (SHIN NIPPON SEITETSU KK) [A] 1,3,6 * abstract * | [A] - KRAEMER W ET AL, "HOCHPRAEZISIONSWALZEN VON STABSTAHL AUF DER FEINSTAHL- UND DRAHTSTRASSE DER VON MOOS STAHL AG (LUZERN/SCHWEIZ)", STAHL UND EISEN, (19900614), vol. 110, no. 6, pages 59 - 64, 196, XP000140620 [A] 1,3,12 * the whole document * |