Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1008171

EP1008171 - METHOD FOR THERMAL SELF-HEALING OF AN SiC SEMICONDUCTOR AREA DOPED BY MEANS OF IMPLANTATION AND A SiC BASED SEMICONDUCTOR COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.08.2002
Database last updated on 13.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.10.2002  [2002/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SiCED Electronics Development GmbH & Co KG
Paul-Gossen-Strasse 100
91052 Erlangen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/37]For all designated states
Siced Electronics Development GmbH & Co. Kg
Paul-Gossen-Strasse 100
91052 Erlangen / DE
Former [2000/24]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / HÖLZLEIN, Karlheinz
St.-Georg-Strasse 38a
D-91315 Höchstadt / DE
02 / STEIN, Rene
Waldstrasse 7a
D-91341 Röttenbach / DE
[2000/24]
Representative(s)Zedlitz, Peter , et al
OSRAM GmbH
Intellectual Property IP
Postfach 22 13 17
80503 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/37]Zedlitz, Peter, Dipl.-Inf. , et al
Patentanwalt, Postfach 22 16 34
80503 München / DE
Application number, filing date98949885.213.08.1998
[2000/24]
WO1998DE02348
Priority number, dateDE199713647921.08.1997         Original published format: DE 19736479
[2000/24]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9910920
Date:04.03.1999
Language:DE
[1999/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1008171
Date:14.06.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.1999
[2000/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.03.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/265, H01L21/324, H01L29/78
[2000/24]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT [2000/24]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM THERMISCHEN AUSHEILEN EINES DURCH IMPLANTATION DOTIERTEN SiC-HALBLEITERGEBIETES UND HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT AUF SiC-BASIS[2000/24]
English:METHOD FOR THERMAL SELF-HEALING OF AN SiC SEMICONDUCTOR AREA DOPED BY MEANS OF IMPLANTATION AND A SiC BASED SEMICONDUCTOR COMPONENT[2000/24]
French:PROCEDE POUR L'AUTOREGENERATION THERMIQUE D'UNE REGION SEMICONDUCTRICE DE SiC DOPEE PAR IMPLANTATION ET COMPOSANT A SEMI-CONDUCTEURS A BASE DE SiC[2000/24]
Entry into regional phase18.02.2000National basic fee paid 
18.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
18.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.02.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
18.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/24]
01.03.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/41]
08.05.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2002/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200104   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XY]  - RAO M V ET AL, "PHOSPHOROUS AND BORON IMPLANTATION IN 6H-SIC", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, (19970515), vol. 81, no. 10, pages 6635 - 6641, XP000658301 [X] 1-6,8-10,19-21,23-25 * page 6636, column R * [Y] 13,14

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.365236
 [Y]  - KIMOTO T ET AL, "ION-IMPLANTATION INTO ASPIRE-SIC EPILAYERS AND APPLICATION TO HIGH-TEMPERATURE, HIGH-VOLTAGE DEVICES", COMPOUND SEMICONDUCTORS 1995. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 22ND. INTERNATIONA SYMPOSIUM ON COMPOUND SEMICONDUCTORS, CHEJU ISLAND, KOREA, AUG. 28 - SEPT. 2, 1995, JONG-CHUN WOO;YOON SOO PARK (EDS ), (19950828), no. SYMP. 22, pages 609 - 614, XP000590342 [Y] 13,14 * page 610 *