blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1005624

EP1005624 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR REFRIGERATING, ESPECIALLY FREEZING, GOODS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.03.2003
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip28.08.2009Change - representativepublished on 30.09.2009  [2009/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Heschel, Ingo
Amstelbachstrasse 25
52134 Herzogenrath / DE
For all designated states
Rau, Günter, Prof. Dr.
Fuchserde 50
D-52066 Aachen / DE
[2000/23]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/23]
Representative(s)Castell, Klaus
Patentanwaltskanzlei Liermann-Castell
Oberstraße 135
52349 Düren / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/40]Castell, Klaus
Patentanwaltskanzlei Liermann - Castell Gutenbergstrasse 12
52349 Düren / DE
Former [2000/23]Castell, Klaus, Dr.
Gutenbergstrasse 12
52349 Düren / DE
Application number, filing date98949922.320.08.1998
[2000/23]
WO1998DE02427
Priority number, dateDE1997103637221.08.1997         Original published format: DE 19736372
[2000/23]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO9910693
Date:04.03.1999
Language:DE
[1999/09]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1005624
Date:07.06.2000
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1005624
Date:08.05.2002
Language:DE
[2002/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.05.1999
ClassificationIPC:F25D31/00
[2000/23]
CPC:
F25D31/001 (EP,US); F25D3/10 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/23]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM KÜHLEN, INSBESONDERE GEFRIEREN EINES KÜHLGUTES[2000/23]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR REFRIGERATING, ESPECIALLY FREEZING, GOODS[2000/23]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR REFRIGERER, EN PARTICULIER CONGELER, UN MATERIAU[2000/23]
Entry into regional phase14.02.2000National basic fee paid 
14.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
14.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.02.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/23]
09.07.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
09.11.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.01.2002Fee for grant paid
07.01.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.02.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
13.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT08.05.2002
NL08.05.2002
ES28.11.2002
[2008/16]
Former [2004/04]NL08.05.2002
ES28.11.2002
Former [2003/09]NL08.05.2002
Cited inInternational search[XY]FR2632391  (TRAPANI SAUVEUR [FR]) [X] 1,3,5,7,19,24 * page 4, line 1 - line 29; figure 2 * [Y] 6,22;
 [DY]DE4437091  (SPUTTEK ANDREAS DR MED [DE], et al) [DY] 6,22 * column 3, line 47 - column 5, line 26; figure 3 *;
 [X]DE4206705  (BLUTSPENDEDIENST DT ROTE KREUZ [DE]) [X] 1,4-7,19,23,24 * column 1, line 36 - column 2, line 23; figure 1 *;
 [X]JPH04211351  ;
 [PXA]DE19619152  (MINGERS BERND DIPL ING [DE]) [PX] 1,3-5,7,19,22-24 * column 13, line 15 - column 14, line 50; figure 2 * * figure 2 * [A] 8;
 [XY]US4018911  (LIONETTI FABIAN J, et al) [X] 9,14,16 * column 2, line 46 - column 3, line 4; figures 1,5 * [Y] 17,18;
 [X]WO9621351  (UNIV ALBERTA [CA], et al) [X] 9,14 * page 7, line 4 - page 8, line 35; figure 2 *;
 [Y]EP0448292  (INSTACOOL INC [US]) [Y] 17,18 * page 7, line 6 - line 24; figure 5 *;
 [XA]EP0475144  (INSTACOOL OF NORTH AMERICA INC [US]) [X] 1 * page 5, line 44 - page 6, line 5; figure 4 * [A] 8
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921120), vol. 016, no. 552, Database accession no. (C - 1006), & JP04211351 A 19920803 (MITSUBISHI KASEI ENJINIARINGU KK;OTHERS: 01) [X] 1,7,21,24 * abstract *
by applicantDE3142521
 DE4437091
 WO9009184
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.