EP1017685 - NEW 2-(3H)-OXAZOLONE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.10.2003 [2003/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Almirall Prodesfarma, S.A. General Mitre 151 08022 Barcelona / ES | [2000/43] |
Former [2000/28] | For all designated states ALMIRALL-PRODESFARMA, S.A. 151, Ronda del General Mitre 08022 Barcelona / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PUIG DURAN, Carles Calle Asturias, 93, 2o-2a E-08024 Barcelona / ES | 02 /
FEIXAS GRAS, Joan Calle Castillejos, 363, 2o-3a E-08025 Barcelona / ES | 03 /
JIMENEZ MAYORGA, Juan M. Calle Dr. Roux, 74, Ppal. 2a E-08017 Barcelona / ES | 04 /
CRESPO CRESPO, Ma Isabel Calle Comte d'Urgell 259, 6o-3a E-08036 Barcelona / ES | [2000/28] | Representative(s) | Goldin, Douglas Michael J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/28] | Goldin, Douglas Michael J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 98950000.4 | 08.09.1998 | [2000/28] | WO1998EP05694 | Priority number, date | ES19970001928 | 12.09.1997 Original published format: ES 9701928 | [2000/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9914205 | Date: | 25.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1017685 | Date: | 12.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07D263/38, A61K31/42 | [2000/28] | CPC: |
C07D263/38 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P11/08 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/28] | Extension states | AL | 24.03.2000 | LT | 24.03.2000 | LV | 24.03.2000 | MK | 24.03.2000 | RO | 24.03.2000 | SI | 24.03.2000 | Title | German: | 2-(3H)-OXAZOLONE DERIVATE | [2000/28] | English: | NEW 2-(3H)-OXAZOLONE DERIVATIVES | [2000/28] | French: | NOUVEAUX DERIVES DE 2-(3H)-OXAZOLONE | [2000/28] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/28] | 01.04.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/41] | 06.05.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9427980 (SEARLE & CO [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * claim - *; | [PX]WO9734882 (GRUPO FARMACEUTICO ALMIRALL S [ES], et al) [PX] 1-21 * claim - *; | [PX]WO9811080 (UNION PHARMA SCIENT APPL [FR]) [PX] 1-21 * claim - * |