Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1035802

EP1035802 - SYSTEM FOR RECONSTRUCTING TORQUE BETWEEN THE NATURAL KNEE AND AN AREA OF THE NATURAL HIP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.02.2005
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 09.07.2008  [2008/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ESKA Implants GmbH & Co.
Grapengiesserstrasse 34
23556 Lübeck / DE
[2000/38]
Inventor(s)01 / GRUNDEI, Hans
Hamburger Strasse 89
D-23558 Lübeck / DE
[2000/38]
Representative(s)Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 46 60
65036 Wiesbaden / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/28]Fuchs
Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60
65036 Wiesbaden / DE
Former [2000/38]Fuchs Mehler Weiss & Fritzsche
Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60
65036 Wiesbaden / DE
Application number, filing date98950033.515.09.1998
[2000/38]
WO1998EP05837
Priority number, dateDE199715323601.12.1997         Original published format: DE 19753236
[2000/38]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9927860
Date:10.06.1999
Language:DE
[1999/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1035802
Date:20.09.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.1999
[2000/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1035802
Date:07.04.2004
Language:DE
[2004/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.06.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/15
[2000/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2000/38]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM ZUR REKONSTRUKTION DER TORQUIERTHEIT ZWISCHEN DEM NATÜRLICHEN KNIE UND DEM BEREICH DER NATÜRLICHEN HÜFTE[2000/38]
English:SYSTEM FOR RECONSTRUCTING TORQUE BETWEEN THE NATURAL KNEE AND AN AREA OF THE NATURAL HIP[2000/38]
French:SYSTEME DE RESTAURATION DU COUPLE ENTRE LE GENOU NATUREL ET LA ZONE HANCHE NATURELLE[2000/38]
Entry into regional phase12.11.1999National basic fee paid 
12.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
12.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.02.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/38]
25.09.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.01.2004Fee for grant paid
22.01.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
21.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
10.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
22.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0709061  (MERCK BIOMATERIAL FRANCE [FR], et al) [A] 1 * column 5, line 30 - line 39 * * column 6, line 42 - line 48 * * column 9, line 9 - line 25 *;
 [A]US5364401  (FERRANTE JOSEPH M [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 6, line 7 - line 17 *
by applicantDE19716300
 DE4423717
 DE4141757