EP1021441 - SUBSTITUTED 2,4-DIAMINO-1,3,5-TRIAZINE AND THEIR USE AS HERBICIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.07.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.09.2004 [2004/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer CropScience AG Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/48] | For all designated states Bayer CropScience AG Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50 40789 Monheim / DE | ||
Former [2000/30] | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIEBEL, Hans-Jochem In der Beek 92 D-42113 Wuppertal / DE | 02 /
LEHR, Stefan Am Benthal 54 D-51381 Leverkusen / DE | 03 /
STELZER, Uwe Adolph-Kolping-Strasse 22a D-51399 Burscheid / DE | 04 /
DOLLINGER, Markus 13210 Knox, Overland Park Kansas 66213 / US | 05 /
DREWES, Mark, Wilhelm Goethestrasse 38 D-40764 Langenfeld / DE | 06 /
MYERS, Randy, Allen Heltorfer Mark 47 D-40489 Düsseldorf / DE | [2000/30] | Application number, filing date | 98950080.6 | 24.09.1998 | [2000/30] | WO1998EP06098 | Priority number, date | DE1997144232 | 07.10.1997 Original published format: DE 19744232 | [2000/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9918100 | Date: | 15.04.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1021441 | Date: | 26.07.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07D409/12, C07D405/12, A01N43/68, C07D333/20, C07D333/28 | [2000/30] | CPC: |
C07D409/12 (EP,KR,US);
C07D251/18 (KR);
A01N43/68 (EP,KR,US);
C07D307/52 (KR);
C07D333/20 (EP,KR,US);
C07D333/28 (KR);
C07D405/12 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2000/30] | Title | German: | SUBSTITUIERTE 2,4-DIAMINO-1,3,5-TRIAZINE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS HERBIZIDE | [2000/30] | English: | SUBSTITUTED 2,4-DIAMINO-1,3,5-TRIAZINE AND THEIR USE AS HERBICIDES | [2000/30] | French: | 2,4-DIAMINO-1,3,5-TRIAZINES SUBSTITUEES ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME HERBICIDES | [2000/30] | Entry into regional phase | 08.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 08.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/30] | 20.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/36] | 02.04.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX]JPS63222166 ; | [DX]US3816419 (CROSS B, et al) [DX] 1-9 * column 1, line 57 - column 2, line 12 *; | JPH06905218 [ ] (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO., LTD.); | [DY]EP0411153 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP]) [DY] 1-9 * siehe das ganze Dokument; im besonderen die Verbindungen der Beispiele 30-32 in Tabelle 2 auf Seite 24 *; | [Y]EP0581960 (KUMIAI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-9 * siehe Seite 76 - Seite 78; Anspruch 1 (hierin im besonderen die heterocyclischen Ringe (A-2) und (A-15)) *; | [A]DE2115318 (ESSO RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING CO.) [A] 1-3,5-8 * the whole document * | [DX] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 88, no. 43, Database accession no. 88-303295, XP002090401 & JPS63222166 A 19880916 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO LTD) [DX] 1-3,5-8 * abstract * | [X] - KELAREV V I ET AL, "Synthesis of N-substituted 2,4-diamino-1,3,5-triazines containing furfuryl groups", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19940228), vol. 120, no. 9, Database accession no. 106941, XP002090399 [X] 1-4 * abstract * | [ ] - IZV. VYSSH.. UCHEBN. ZAVED., KHIM. TEKHNOL., (1993), vol. 36, no. 4, pages 33 - 39 | [X] - ISHIDA N ET AL, "1-Furfurylbiguanides", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19690707), vol. 071, no. 1, Database accession no. 003254n, XP002090400 [X] 9 * abstract * |