EP1012790 - METHOD FOR RECEIVING AND STORING OPTICALLY DETECTABLE DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.09.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Müller, Markus R. Buchzelgstrasse 21/4 8053 Zürich / CH | [2000/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/26] | Representative(s) | Lucht, Silvia, et al Geitz Truckenmüller Lucht Patentanwälte Werthmannstrasse 15 79098 Freiburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/39] | Lucht, Silvia, et al Patentanwälte Geitz, Truckenmüller, Lucht Kaiser-Joseph-Strasse 260 79098 Freiburg / DE | ||
Former [2000/26] | Vogler, Silvia, et al Patentanwälte Schuster & Partner Wiederholdstrasse 10 70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 98950238.0 | 11.09.1998 | [2000/26] | WO1998IB01516 | Priority number, date | DE1997140038 | 11.09.1997 Original published format: DE 19740038 | [2000/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9913431 | Date: | 18.03.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1012790 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1012790 | Date: | 30.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G06T11/00, G06T17/00 | [2000/26] | CPC: |
G06T5/50 (EP);
G06T7/97 (EP);
G06T2207/20228 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2000/26] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR AUFNAHME UND ZUR ABSPEICHERUNG OPTISCH ERFASSBARER DATEN | [2000/26] | English: | METHOD FOR RECEIVING AND STORING OPTICALLY DETECTABLE DATA | [2000/26] | French: | PROCEDE D'ENREGISTREMENT ET DE MEMORISATION DE DONNEES DETECTEES PAR VOIE OPTIQUE | [2000/26] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/26] | 25.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 30.10.2002 | GB | 30.10.2002 | IT | 30.10.2002 | NL | 30.10.2002 | ES | 29.04.2003 | [2008/16] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 30.10.2002 | |
GB | 30.10.2002 | ||
NL | 30.10.2002 | ||
ES | 29.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | GB | 30.10.2002 | |
NL | 30.10.2002 | ||
ES | 29.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | NL | 30.10.2002 | |
ES | 29.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | NL | 30.10.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9725690 (OLSSON KJELL [SE]) [A] 1-4,8-11,20 * abstract * * page 3, lines 9-40 * * page 4, lines 35-47 *; | [A] - KANG S B ET AL, "3-D SCENE DATA RECOVERY USING OMNIDIRECTIONAL MULTIBASELINE STEREO", PROC. OF THE IEEE COMP. SOC. CONF. ON COMPUTE VISION AND PATTERN RECOGNITION, SAN FRANCISCO, JUNE 18 - 20, 1996, IEEE, pages 364 - 370, XP000640255 [A] 1,20 * paragraph [0004]; figures 1-4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CVPR.1996.517098 | [A] - MCMILLAN L ET AL, "PLENOPTIC MODELING: AN IMAGE-BASED RENDERING SYSTEM", COMPUTER GRAPHICS PROCEEDINGS, LOS ANGELES, AUG. 6 - 11, 1995, pages 39 - 46, XP000546214 [A] 1,20 * paragraph [0005]; figure 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/218380.218398 | [A] - PANKAJ DANI ET AL, "AUTOMATED ASSEMBLING OF IMAGES: IMAGE MONTAGE PREPARATION", PATTERN RECOGNITION, (199503), vol. 28, no. 3, pages 431 - 445, XP000494937 [A] 1,20 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0031-3203(94)00106-V |