EP1060878 - PHOTOCURABLE SHEET, MOLDINGS THEREOF, AND PROCESSES FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2011 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.08.2011 [2011/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI RAYON CO., LTD. 6-41, Konan 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8506 / JP | [2010/38] |
Former [2000/51] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd. 6-41, Konan 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8506 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANAGASE, Akira, Products Development Laboratories Mitsubishi Rayon Co.Ltd., 1-60 Sunadabashi 4-chome Higashi-ku, Nagoya-shi, Aichi 461-8677 / JP | 02 /
FUJIWARA, Tadayuki, Corporate Research Laboratories Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd., 20-1, Miyuki-cho Otake-shi, Hiroshima 739-0693 / JP | 03 /
KAKUNO, Yoko, Corporate Research Laboratories Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd., 20-1, Miyuki-cho Otake-shi, Hiroshima 739-0693 / JP | 04 /
WAKISAKA, Yukiya, Corporate Research Laboratories Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd., 20-1, Miyuki-cho Otake-shi, Hiroshima 739-0693 / JP | [2010/38] |
Former [2000/51] | 01 /
YANAGASE, Akira, products development Lab. Mitsubishi Rayon Co.Ltd., 1-60 Sunadabashi 4-chome Higashi-ku, Nagoya-shi, Aichi 461-8677 / JP | ||
02 /
FUJIWARA, Tadayuki, Corporate Res. Lab. Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd., 20-1, Miyuki-cho Otake-shi, Hiroshima 739-0693 / JP | |||
03 /
KAKUNO, Yoko, Corporate Res. Lab. Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd., 20-1, Miyuki-cho Otake-shi, Hiroshima 739-0693 / JP | |||
04 /
WAKISAKA, Yukiya, Corporate Res. Lab. Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd., 20-1, Miyuki-cho Otake-shi, Hiroshima 739-0693 / JP | Representative(s) | ter Meer, Nicolaus Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/51] | ter Meer, Nicolaus Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner GbR, Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98950352.9 | 22.10.1998 | [2000/51] | WO1998JP04794 | Priority number, date | JP19980052069 | 04.03.1998 Original published format: JP 5206998 | JP19980052084 | 04.03.1998 Original published format: JP 5208498 | [2000/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9944827 | Date: | 10.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1060878 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1060878 | Date: | 22.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.09.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/30, B29C45/14 | [2000/51] | CPC: |
C08F290/046 (EP,US);
B29C45/14778 (EP);
C08F220/32 (EP,US);
C09D4/06 (EP);
B29C45/1418 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C09D4/06, C08F290/046 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/51] | Title | German: | PHOTOVERNETZBARE FOLIE,DARAUS HERGESTELLTE FORMMASSEN UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [2000/51] | English: | PHOTOCURABLE SHEET, MOLDINGS THEREOF, AND PROCESSES FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [2000/51] | French: | FEUILLE PHOTODURCISSABLE, MOULAGES DE CELLE-CI ET PROCEDES DE PRODUCTION ASSOCIES | [2000/51] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2000 | Translation filed | 29.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2000 | Search fee paid | 29.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 29.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/51] | 14.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2018621 (GEN ELECTRIC) [X] 1* claim 1 *; | [X]EP0814115 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,6 * claims 1,7 * | International search | [Y]JPS62128816U ; | [Y]JPH04201216 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [Y]JPH0584772 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [A]JPH07323B ; | [Y]JPH093288 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO); | [Y]JPH09267357 (NISSHA PRINTING) |