Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0973114

EP0973114 - AN ORDER DATA MANAGEMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  17.05.2002
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 09.07.2008  [2008/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Toshiba TEC Kabushiki Kaisha
1-1, Kanda Nishiki-cho
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101-8442 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
Toshiba Tec Kabushiki Kaisha
1-1, Kanda Nishiki-cho, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101-8442 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / SANO, Kouichi
111-1, Kitada, Yuicho
Ihara-gun, Shizuoka-ken 421-3104 / JP
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 46 60
65036 Wiesbaden / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/28]Fuchs
Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60
65036 Wiesbaden / DE
Former [2000/03]Fuchs Mehler Weiss & Fritzsche
Patentanwälte Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 7
65189 Wiesbaden / DE
Application number, filing date98950477.430.10.1998
[2000/03]
WO1998JP04937
Priority number, dateJP1997030390006.11.1997         Original published format: JP 30390097
JP1998024366728.08.1998         Original published format: JP 24366798
[2000/03]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9924929
Date:20.05.1999
Language:EN
[1999/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973114
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.1999
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP20.05.1999
ClassificationInternational:G06F19/00, G06F17/60
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2000/03]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM ZUM VERWALTEN VON BESTELLDATEN[2000/03]
English:AN ORDER DATA MANAGEMENT SYSTEM[2000/03]
French:SYSTEME DE GESTION DES DONNEES DE COMMANDE[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase18.06.1999Translation filed 
18.06.1999National basic fee paid 
18.06.1999Search fee paid 
18.06.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
18.06.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.06.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
09.02.2002Application withdrawn by applicant  [2002/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
14.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[Y]JPH08153282  (SHARP KK);
 [Y]JPH0494226  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD);
 [Y]JPH03119467  (NITSUKO LTD);
 [Y]JPS61278964  (NCR CO)