Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1032273

EP1032273 - A METHOD OF PRODUCING A MIXTURE AND A BAKING PLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  03.10.2003
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.10.2003Refusal of applicationpublished on 19.11.2003  [2003/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cerealia R&D AB
153 81 Järna / SE
[2000/42]
Former [2000/36]For all designated states
Cerealia Utveckling AB
153 81 Järna / SE
Inventor(s)01 / BLOMQVIST, Lars, Göran
Svampstigen 96
S-144 40 Rönninge / SE
02 / CARLSSON, Göran
Apelvägen 89
S-703 58 Örebro / SE
03 / SVENSSON, Jan, Erik
Borgvägen 9
S-640 45 Kvicksund / SE
04 / WIDE, Peter
Järstad
S-681 00 Kristinehamn / SE
[2000/36]
Representative(s)Karlsson, Leif Karl Gunnar
L.A. Groth & Co. KB
Box 6107
102 32 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2000/36]Karlsson, Leif Karl Gunnar
L.A. Groth & Co. KB, Box 6107
102 32 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date98950586.220.10.1998
[2000/36]
WO1998SE01889
Priority number, dateSE1997000384122.10.1997         Original published format: SE 9703841
[2000/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9920113
Date:29.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1032273
Date:06.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.1999
[2000/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE29.04.1999
ClassificationInternational:A21D8/02, A21C1/00
[2000/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/36]
Extension statesLT22.05.2000
LV22.05.2000
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER MISCHUNG SOWIE EINE BACKANLAGE[2000/36]
English:A METHOD OF PRODUCING A MIXTURE AND A BAKING PLANT[2000/36]
French:PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN MELANGE ET INSTALLATION DE CUISSON[2000/36]
Entry into regional phase22.05.2000National basic fee paid 
22.05.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
22.05.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.03.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
22.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
06.05.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.06.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.09.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.05.2003Date of oral proceedings
13.06.2003Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
17.06.2003Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2003/47]
27.06.2003Application refused, date of legal effect [2003/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
21.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0428241  (SYSTEM SOUGOU KAIHATSU CO LTD [JP]);
 [X]US5472273  (FOWLER EDDIE R [US], et al)