Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1019086

EP1019086 - ALTERED DNA SYNTHESOME COMPONENTS AS BIOMARKERS FOR MALIGNANCY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.04.2005
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.04.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.06.2005  [2005/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
University of Maryland, Baltimore
520 West Baltimore Street
Baltimore, MD 21201 / US
[2000/29]
Inventor(s)01 / MALKAS, Linda, H.
239 Kensington Parkway
Abingdon, MD 21009 / US
02 / HICKEY, Robert, J.
239 Kensington Parkway
Abingdon, MD 21009 / US
03 / BECHTEL, Pamela, E.
6385D Smithy Square
Glen Burnie, MD 21061 / US
[2000/29]
Representative(s)Jones, Elizabeth Louise , et al
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/29]Jones, Elizabeth Louise , et al
Frank B. Dehn & Co., 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Application number, filing date98950772.829.09.1998
[2000/29]
WO1998US20444
Priority number, dateUS19970060249P29.09.1997         Original published format: US 60249 P
US19980085200P12.05.1998         Original published format: US 85200 P
[2000/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9916469
Date:08.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1019086
Date:19.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.1999
[2000/29]
Search report(s)International search reportUS08.04.1999
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP06.11.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61K39/395, G01N33/574, C07K16/00
[2000/29]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/29]
TitleGerman:VERÄNDERTE DNS SYNTHESOMKOMPONENTEN ALS BIOMARKER BEI KREBS[2000/29]
English:ALTERED DNA SYNTHESOME COMPONENTS AS BIOMARKERS FOR MALIGNANCY[2000/29]
French:COMPOSANTS MODIFIES DE SYNTHESOME D'ADN[2000/29]
Entry into regional phase24.03.2000National basic fee paid 
24.03.2000Search fee paid 
24.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
24.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.03.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
24.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/29]
21.01.2004Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.11.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/22]
16.12.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
24.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
23.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
25.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
23.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH07191037  ;
 [X]JPH0412273  ;
 [X]US5580903  (MAWATARI KAZUNORI [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * column 3, lines 34-36 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951130), vol. 1995, no. 10, [X] 1-6,12,18,22-27 * abstract *
 [X]  - HE ZHIGANG ET AL, "Assessing the requirements for nucleotide excision repair proteins of Saccharomyces cerevisiae in an in vitro system.", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1996), vol. 271, no. 45, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 28243 - 28249, XP002245881 [X] 1-6 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.271.45.28243
 [X]  - 1, vol. 1992, no. 09, Database accession no. 1992-068780, XP002245882 [X] 1-6 * abstract *
 [X]  - YAGURA T ET AL, "IMMUNOCHEMICAL DETECTION OF A PRIMASE ACTIVITY RELATED SUBUNIT OF DNA POLYMERASE ALPHA FROM HUMAN AND MOUSE CELLS USING THE MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY", BIOCHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. EASTON, PA, US, (1987), vol. 26, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 7749 - 7754, XP002911365 [X] 1-6 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi00398a032
 [X]  - WASEEM N H ET AL, "MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY ANALYSIS OF THE PROLIFERATING CELL NUCLEAR ANTIGEN (PCNA) STRUCTURAL CONSERVATION AND THE DETECTION OF A NUCLEOLAR FORM", JOURNAL OF CELL SCIENCE, ESSEX, GB, (19900501), vol. 96, no. 1, pages 121 - 129, XP000938974 [X] 1-6 * the whole document *
International search[A]US5574047  (BUMOL THOMAS F [US], et al);
 [Y]  - COLL J M, ET AL., "THE HUMAN BREAST CELL DNA SYNTHESOME: ITS PURIFICATION FROM TUMOR TISSUE AND CELL CULTURE", ONCOLOGY RESEARCH., PERGAMON PRESS, NEW YORK, NY., US, US, (19960101), vol. 08, ISSN 0965-0407, pages 435 - 447, XP002915978