Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1019475

EP1019475 - DETERGENT COMPOSITION FOR HARD SURFACES COMPRISING HYDROPHILIC SHEAR-THINNING POLYMER AT VERY LOW LEVEL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.10.2006
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.06.2009Change - representativepublished on 15.07.2009  [2009/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[N/P]
Former [2005/50]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Former [2000/29]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / POLICICCHIO, Nicola, John
4976 Laurelwood Court
Mason, OH 45040 / US
02 / SHERRY, Alan, Edward
Apartment 7, 235 Loraine Avenue
Cincinnati, OH 45217 / US
[2000/29]
Representative(s)Canonici, Jean-Jacques , et al
NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA
Temselaan 100
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
[N/P]
Former [2009/29]Canonici, Jean-Jacques , et al
NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA Temselaan 100
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
Former [2005/04]Canonici, Jean-Jacques , et al
NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA, Temselaan 100
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
Former [2000/29]Engisch, Gautier , et al
BVBA Procter & Gamble Europe SPRL, Temselaan 100
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
Application number, filing date98950791.801.10.1998
[2000/29]
WO1998US20513
Priority number, dateUS19970061296P07.10.1997         Original published format: US 61296 P
US19980086447P22.05.1998         Original published format: US 86447 P
[2000/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9918182
Date:15.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1019475
Date:19.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.1999
[2000/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1019475
Date:14.12.2005
Language:EN
[2005/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.04.1999
ClassificationInternational:C11D3/22, C11D3/37, C11D3/30, C11D17/04, A47L13/17
[2000/29]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/29]
TitleGerman:REINIGUNGSMITTEL FÜR HARTE OBERFLÄCHEN, ENTHALTEND HYDROPHILES, SCHERKRAFT-VERDÜNNENDES POLYMER IN SEHR GERINGER MENGE[2000/29]
English:DETERGENT COMPOSITION FOR HARD SURFACES COMPRISING HYDROPHILIC SHEAR-THINNING POLYMER AT VERY LOW LEVEL[2000/29]
French:COMPOSITION DETERGENTE POUR SURFACES DURES A TRES FAIBLE CONTENU DE POLYMERE CISAILLANT-DILUANT[2000/29]
Entry into regional phase03.05.2000National basic fee paid 
03.05.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
03.05.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.04.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/29]
05.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.07.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
24.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
29.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.05.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.09.2005Fee for grant paid
21.09.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.09.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/47]
Request for further processing for:24.09.2003Request for further processing filed
24.09.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
14.10.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
08.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
07.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
06.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
06.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
07.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT14.12.2005
BE14.12.2005
CH14.12.2005
CY14.12.2005
FI14.12.2005
LI14.12.2005
NL14.12.2005
DK14.03.2006
GR14.03.2006
SE14.03.2006
PT15.05.2006
[2009/02]
Former [2008/16]AT14.12.2005
BE14.12.2005
CH14.12.2005
FI14.12.2005
LI14.12.2005
NL14.12.2005
DK14.03.2006
GR14.03.2006
SE14.03.2006
PT15.05.2006
Former [2007/02]AT14.12.2005
BE14.12.2005
CH14.12.2005
FI14.12.2005
LI14.12.2005
NL14.12.2005
DK14.03.2006
GR14.03.2006
SE14.03.2006
PT15.05.2006
Former [2006/49]AT14.12.2005
BE14.12.2005
CH14.12.2005
FI14.12.2005
LI14.12.2005
NL14.12.2005
GR14.03.2006
SE14.03.2006
PT15.05.2006
Former [2006/45]AT14.12.2005
BE14.12.2005
CH14.12.2005
FI14.12.2005
LI14.12.2005
NL14.12.2005
GR14.03.2006
SE14.03.2006
Former [2006/38]AT14.12.2005
BE14.12.2005
CH14.12.2005
FI14.12.2005
LI14.12.2005
GR14.03.2006
SE14.03.2006
Former [2006/36]AT14.12.2005
BE14.12.2005
CH14.12.2005
FI14.12.2005
LI14.12.2005
SE14.03.2006
Former [2006/34]AT14.12.2005
CH14.12.2005
FI14.12.2005
LI14.12.2005
SE14.03.2006
Former [2006/33]CH14.12.2005
FI14.12.2005
LI14.12.2005
SE14.03.2006
Former [2006/27]FI14.12.2005
SE14.03.2006
Former [2006/24]FI14.12.2005
Cited inInternational search[X]US4747880  (BERRIDO COLIN ET AL) [X] 1-4,6,9 * column 6, line 22 - line 30 * * column 4, line 58 - column 5, line 2 * * examples 1,2; claim 2 *;
 [X]GB1357323  (UNILEVER LTD) [X] 1,6 * page 1, column 2, line 20 - line 26 * * page 1, column 2, line 31 - line 35 * * page 1, column 2, line 63 - line 67 * * page 1, column 2, line 91 - page 2, column 1, line 14 * * examples 1,4-6; claims 1,4-6 *;
 [A]EP0174689  (UNILEVER NV ;UNILEVER PLC (GB)) [A] 1 * column 1, line 32 - line 41 * * claims 1,5 * * column 2, line 5 - line 18 *;
 [E]WO9842819  (POLICICCHIO NICOLA JOHN ;MASTERS RONALD ANTHONY (US); PROCTER & GA) [E] 1-10 * claim - *;
 [A]EP0357496  (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO) [A] 8,10 * page 3, line 31 - line 41 *;
 [A]EP0215451  (HENKEL KGAA) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 48 - line 55 * * column 6, line 45 - column 7, line 3; table - *