Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1018259

EP1018259 - FLICKER FILTERING AND OVERSCAN COMPENSATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.11.2007
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.11.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.12.2007  [2007/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
S3 Graphics Co., Ltd.
Ritchie & Duckworth, Zephyr House, Mary Street, P.O. Box 709
Grand Cayman, British West Indies / KY
[2006/52]
Former [2004/34]For all designated states
S3 Graphics Co., Ltd.
Ritchie & Duckworth, Zephyr House, Mary Street, P.O. Box 709
Grand Cayman, British West Indies / KY
Former [2000/28]For all designated states
S3 Incorporated
2801 Mission College Blvd.
Santa Clara, California 95052-8058 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HERZ, William, S.
39708 Potrero Drive
Newark, CA 94560 / US
02 / YICHOU, Lin
Apartment 149, 3707 Poinciana Drive
Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US
[2000/28]
Representative(s)Käck, Jürgen , et al
Patentanwälte
Kahler Käck Mollekopf
Vorderer Anger 239
86899 Landsberg/Lech / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/40]Käck, Jürgen , et al
Kahler Käck Mollekopf Vorderer Anger 239
86899 Landsberg / DE
Former [2000/28]Kahler, Kurt, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Kahler, Käck, Fiener et col., Vorderer Anger 268
86899 Landsberg/Lech / DE
Application number, filing date98950851.029.09.1998
[2000/28]
WO1998US20708
Priority number, dateUS1997094214329.09.1997         Original published format: US 942143
[2000/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9917540
Date:08.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1018259
Date:12.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.1999
[2000/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1018259
Date:27.12.2006
Language:EN
[2006/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US08.04.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.03.2004
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/44
[2004/18]
Former International [2000/28]H04N5/21
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2000/28]
TitleGerman:FLICKERFILTERUNG UND KOMPENSATION DER ÜBERABTASTUNG[2000/28]
English:FLICKER FILTERING AND OVERSCAN COMPENSATION[2000/28]
French:FILTRAGE DU PAPILLOTEMENT ET COMPENSATION DU SURBALAYAGE[2000/28]
Entry into regional phase28.04.2000National basic fee paid 
28.04.2000Search fee paid 
28.04.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
28.04.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.04.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
28.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/28]
24.10.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.05.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.07.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.11.2006Fee for grant paid
10.11.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.09.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
28.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
27.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
30.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
30.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
30.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
29.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[X]US5455628  (BISHOP MICHAEL D [GB]) [X] 1,3,10 * column 2, line 62 - column 6 *;
 [A]US5519446  (LEE DONG H [KR]) [A] 1-26 * column 2, line 50 - column 11, line 38 *;
 [A]US5619438  (FARLEY SHAL W [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * column 3, line 40 - column 21 *;
 [A]EP0719041  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-26 * page 6 - page 11, line 43 *;
 [A]EP0751682  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-26 * column 6, line 36 - column 33 *;
 [A]US5349385  (GLENN WILLIAM E [US]) [A] 1-26 * column 3, line 13 - column 6, line 22 *
International search[XP]US5812203  (SWAN PHILIP L [CA], et al);
 [X]US5019904  (CAMPBELL JACK J [US]);
 [XE]US5822008  (INOUE SADAYUKI [JP], et al)