Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1027198

EP1027198 - VENT DEVICE, VENTED MOLD AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A MOLDED ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.02.2004
Database last updated on 22.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
WOODBRIDGE FOAM CORPORATION
4240 Sherwoodtowne Blvd., Suite 300 Mississauga
Ontario L4Z 2G6 / CA
[N/P]
Former [2000/33]For all designated states
WOODBRIDGE FOAM CORPORATION
4240 Sherwoodtowne Blvd., Suite 300
Mississauga, Ontario L4Z 2G6 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / HUNTER, Craig, A.
886 Childs Drive
Milton, Ontario L9T 4J6 / CA
02 / BALBAA, Hassan
Apt. 708, 2101 Islington Av.
Etobicoke, Ontario M9P 3R2 / CA
[2000/33]
Representative(s)Weitzel, Wolfgang
Dr. Weitzel & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB
Friedenstrasse 10
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/33]Weitzel, Wolfgang, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwalt
Friedenstrasse 10
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Application number, filing date98951125.829.10.1998
[2000/33]
WO1998CA01000
Priority number, dateUS1997096204131.10.1997         Original published format: US 962041
[2000/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9922924
Date:14.05.1999
Language:EN
[1999/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1027198
Date:16.08.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.1999
[2000/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1027198
Date:02.04.2003
Language:EN
[2003/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.05.1999
ClassificationInternational:B29C44/58, B29C33/10
[2000/33]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   IT [2000/33]
TitleGerman:ENTGASUNGSVORRICHTUNG, ENTLÜFTETE FORM UND VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINES GEFORMTEN GEGENSTANDS[2000/33]
English:VENT DEVICE, VENTED MOLD AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A MOLDED ARTICLE[2000/33]
French:DISPOSITIF D'EVENT, MOULE DESAERE ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN ARTICLE MOULE[2000/33]
Entry into regional phase28.07.1999National basic fee paid 
28.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
28.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/46]
29.07.1999Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.03.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.11.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
23.01.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.01.2003Fee for grant paid
09.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/13]
Request for further processing for:23.01.2002Request for further processing filed
23.01.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
22.02.2002Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
14.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
25.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.11.200104   M06   Fee paid on   14.11.2001
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT02.04.2003
[2008/16]
Cited inInternational search[PX]EP0855260  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [PX] 1-9,21-29,41,43,44 * column 3, paragraph L; figure - *;
 [X]DE3622598  (ELASTOGRAN POLYURETHANE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-9,21-29,41,43,44 * the whole document *;
 [X]JPS61235108  ;
 [A]DE3926446  (FRITSCHE, MÖLLMANN GMBH & CO KG) [A] * figure - *;
 [A]EP0388279  (SELNOR [FR]) [A] 35-37 * figure 4 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870310), vol. 011, no. 078, Database accession no. (M - 570), [X] 1,10-21,30-44 * abstract *