Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1015821

EP1015821 - AIR CLEANING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.05.2003
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 02.12.2009  [2009/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hertfelder, Rolf
Tuchbergstrasse 5
71134 Aidlingen / DE
[2000/51]
Former [2000/27]For all designated states
Hertfelder, Wilhelm
Lindenstrasse 16
71144 Steinenbronn / DE
Inventor(s)01 / HERTFELDER, Wilhelm
Lindenstrasse 16
D-71144 Steinenbronn / DE
02 / HERTFELDER, Rolf
Hauffstrasse 5
D-71134 Aidlingen / DE
[2000/27]
Representative(s)Späth, Dieter , et al
ABACUS
Patentanwälte
Lise-Meitner-Strasse 21
72202 Nagold / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/49]Späth, Dieter , et al
ABACUS Patentanwälte Klocke Späth Barth European Patent and Trademark Attorneys Kappelstrasse 8
72160 Horb / DE
Former [2000/27]Späth, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Klocke & Späth, Patentanwälte, Kappelstrasse 8
72160 Horb / DE
Application number, filing date98951244.701.09.1998
[2000/27]
WO1998DE02562
Priority number, dateDE199714162120.09.1997         Original published format: DE 19741621
[2000/27]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9915837
Date:01.04.1999
Language:DE
[1999/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1015821
Date:05.07.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.1999
[2000/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1015821
Date:17.07.2002
Language:DE
[2002/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.04.1999
ClassificationInternational:F24F3/16
[2000/27]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   FR,   GB,   LI [2000/27]
TitleGerman:LUFTREINIGUNGSEINRICHTUNG[2000/27]
English:AIR CLEANING DEVICE[2000/27]
French:DISPOSITIF DE PURIFICATION D'AIR[2000/27]
Entry into regional phase18.02.2000National basic fee paid 
18.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
18.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.02.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
18.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/27]
20.12.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.01.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.02.2002Fee for grant paid
23.02.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.04.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]US5230720  (KENDALL DELBERT B [US]) [A] 1-7,13,17,18 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4248162  (SKEIST S MERRILL) [A] 1,15,17-19 * column 2, line 7 - line 51; figure - *;
 [A]JPH07184723  ;
 [A]US4792345  (ABE SHUJI [JP], et al)
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951130), vol. 095, no. 010, [A] 1,11,15 * abstract *
by applicantWO9627309
 DE9419827U