Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1016141

EP1016141 - MULTICOLOR-COLOR SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  12.11.2008
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.11.2008Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 03.12.2008  [2008/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Forschungszentrum Jülich GmbH
52425 Jülich / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/36]For all designated states
Forschungszentrum Jülich GmbH
52425 Jülich / DE
Former [2002/28]For all designated states
Forschungszentrum Jülich GmbH
52425 Jülich / DE
Former [2000/27]For all designated states
FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM JÜLICH GMBH
Wilhelm-Johnen-Strasse
52425 Jülich / DE
Inventor(s)01 / STIEBIG, Helmut
Römerstrasse 18C
D-52428 Jülich / DE
02 / KNIPP, Dietmar
Am Gerhardsbangert 1
D-53773 Hennef / DE
03 / FÖLSCH, Joachim
Friedberger Gä chen 2
D-63755 Alzenau / DE
04 / WAGNER, Heribert
Talstrasse 1
D-52428 Jülich / DE
[2000/27]
Application number, filing date98951263.728.08.1998
[2000/27]
WO1998DE02593
Priority number, dateDE199713756128.08.1997         Original published format: DE 19737561
[2000/27]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9912205
Date:11.03.1999
Language:DE
[1999/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1016141
Date:05.07.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.1999
[2000/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.03.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01L25/04
[2000/27]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [2000/27]
TitleGerman:MEHRFARBENSENSOR[2000/27]
English:MULTICOLOR-COLOR SENSOR[2000/27]
French:DETECTEUR DE PLUSIEURS COULEURS[2000/27]
Entry into regional phase01.03.2000National basic fee paid 
01.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
01.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.03.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
01.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/27]
13.12.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.10.2008Application withdrawn by applicant  [2008/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
20.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
18.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
23.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
27.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
21.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
01.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
12.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
04.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
Cited inInternational search[X]US4875944  (YOSHIDA TAKASHI [JP]) [X] 1-3,6 * abstract *;
 [A]WO9613865  (BOEHM MARKUS [DE]) [A] 1-3,6 * figure 4; claim 10 *;
 [AD]US5311047  (CHANG CHUN-YEN [TW]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *;
 [AD]  - TOPIC M ET AL, "Stacked a-SiC:H/a-Si:H heterostructures for bias-controlled three -colour detectors", JOURNAL OF NON-CRYSTALLINE SOLIDS, (199605), vol. 198-200, page 1180-1184, XP004079646 [AD] 1-3,5 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-3093(96)00109-3
 [A]  - CESARE DE G ET AL, "VARIABLE SPECTRAL RESPONSE PHOTODETECTOR BASED ON CRYSTALLINE/ AMORPHOUS SILICON HETEROSTRUCTURE", JOURNAL OF NON-CRYSTALLINE SOLIDS, (19960501), vol. 198/200, no. PART 02, pages 1189 - 1192, XP000621439 [A] 1-3,6 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-3093(96)00180-9