Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1009746

EP1009746 - SEPARATION OF METHANOL AND PROPYLENE OXIDE FROM A REACTION MIXTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  23.09.2005
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.09.2005Revocation of patentpublished on 09.11.2005  [2005/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ARCO Chemical Technology, L.P.
Two Greenville Crossing, 4001 Kennett Pike, Suite 238
Greenville, Delaware 19807 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/25]For all designated states
ARCO Chemical Technology, L.P.
Two Greenville Crossing, 4001 Kennett Pike, Suite 238
Greenville, Delaware 19807 / US
Inventor(s)01 / RUETER, Michael, A.
350 Maiden Lane
Norristown, PA 19401 / US
02 / JUBIN, John, C., Jr.
144 Summit House
West Chester, PA 19382 / US
[2000/25]
Representative(s)Kooy, G.L. , et al
Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade B.V.
Dr. Kuyperstraat 6
2514 BB The Hague / NL
[N/P]
Former [2001/43]Kooy, G.L. , et al
Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade, Dr. Kuyperstraat 6
2514 BB The Hague / NL
Former [2000/25]Colmer, Stephen Gary , et al
Mathys & Squire 100 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8AL / GB
Application number, filing date98951325.428.08.1998
[2000/25]
WO1998EP05470
Priority number, dateUS1997092642002.09.1997         Original published format: US 926420
[2000/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9911639
Date:11.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1009746
Date:21.06.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.1999
[2000/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1009746
Date:03.04.2002
Language:EN
[2002/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.03.1999
ClassificationInternational:C07D301/32
[2000/25]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/25]
TitleGerman:TRENNUNG VON METHANOL UND PROPYLENOXID AUS EINEM REAKTIOSGEMISCH[2000/25]
English:SEPARATION OF METHANOL AND PROPYLENE OXIDE FROM A REACTION MIXTURE[2000/25]
French:SEPARATION DE L'OXYDE DE PROPYLENE D'UN MELANGE REACTIONNEL CONTENANT DU METHANOL[2000/25]
Entry into regional phase28.02.2000National basic fee paid 
28.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
28.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.03.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/25]
19.07.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.09.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.11.2001Fee for grant paid
22.11.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.11.2004Observations by third parties
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.12.2002  14.01.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Degussa AG
Benningsenplatz 1
40474 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Fleischer, Holm Herbert, et al
polypatent
Postfach 40 02 43
51410 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2003/09]
Opponent(s)01  23.12.2002   
DEGUSSA AG
Benningsenplatz 1
40474 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Fleischer, Holm Herbert, Dr., et al
Sternagel, Fleischer, Godemeyer & Partner Patentanwälte Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
10.02.2003Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
20.08.2003Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
01.12.2004Date of oral proceedings
01.12.2004Legal effect of revocation of patent [2005/45]
10.06.2005Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
10.06.2005Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
21.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[DX]EP0389300  (ARCO CHEM TECH [US]) [DX] 1-3,5-11 * the whole document *;
 [X]US3578568  (WASHALL THOMAS A) [X] 1-3,5-11 * column W *;
 [X]GB2002376  (HALCON RES & DEV) [X] 1-3,5-11 * the whole document *;
 [X]US5620568  (SMITH WILLIAM A [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-11 * column W *;
 [X]US5464505  (PETERS MICHAEL W [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-11 * column W *;
 [X]US5453160  (PETERS MICHAEL W [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-11 * the whole document *;
 [X]US5340446  (NELSON WILLIAM P [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-11 * column W *;
 [X]US5160587  (MARQUIS EDWARD T [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-11 * column W *;
 [X]US5154804  (MARQUIS EDWARD T [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-11 * the whole document *;
 [X]US5154803  (MARQUIS EDWARD T [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-11 * column W *;
 [X]US5145563  (CULBRETH III WILLIAM K [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-11 * column W *;
 [X]US5139622  (MARQUIS EDWARD T [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-11 * column W *;
 [X]US5116465  (YEAKEY ERNEST L [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-11 * column W *
otherEP0568336
 US4140588
 EP0389300
    - GMEHLING J. AND U.ONKEN, "VAPOR-LIQUID EQUILIBRIUM DATA COLLECTION", VAPOR-LIQUID EQUILIBRIUM DATA COLLECTION - AQUEOUS ORGANIC SYSTEMS, (1977), vol. 1, no. 1, pages XIII - XV, XP002989986
    - SATTLER K., "Thermische Trennverfahren - Grundlagen, Auslegung, Apparate", SATTLER K., SATTLER K., Thermische Trennverfahren - Grundlagen, Auslegung, Apparate, VCH, pages 38-40 - 81-85, ISBN 3-527-26727-1, XP002989993
    - SCHLUNDER E-U AND F. THURNER, "Physikalische Grundlagen - Destillation Rektifikation", SCHLUNDER E-U AND F. THURNER, SCHLUNDER E-U AND F. THURNER, Destillation, Absorption Extraktion, STUTTGART, GEORG THIEME VERLAG, pages 19-24 - 57-58, ISBN 3-13-687201-0, XP002989994
    - VOSTRIKOVA V.N., "Liquid - vapor equilibrium in binary systems containing propene oxide", ZHURNAL PRIKLADNOI KHIMII, (19710729), vol. 47, no. 3, pages 570 - 572, XP002989995
    - WICKERT J.N. ET AL, "Phase Equilibria in the system propylene oxide-water", PHASE EQUILIBRIA, (1952), vol. 48, no. 2, pages 92 - 96, XP002989996
    - WILSON L.C. ET AL, "Vapor-Liquid equilibrium measurements on four binary mixtures", EXPERIMENTAL RESULTS FROM THE DESIGN INSTITUTE FOR PHYSICAL PROPERTY DATA: PHASE EQUILIBIRA AND PURE COMPONENT PROPERTIES - PART II, NEW YORK, (1989), vol. 85, no. 271, pages 25 - 42, XP002989997
    - BACH M. ET AL, "Propanole", BACH M. ET AL, FALBE J. ET AL, ROMPP Lexikon Chemie, STUTTGART, THIEME, vol. 5, page 3569, ISBN 3-13-107830-8, XP002989998
    - SINGER M. AND D. STAUDER, "European Patent Convention - a commentary - 3rd edition - Teschemacher Article 83", SINGER M. AND D. STAUDER, SINGER M. AND DIETER STAUDER, European Patent Convention - a commentary - 3rd edition, vol. 1, pages 359 - 360, ISBN 0-421-83150-2, XP002989999