Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0991752

EP0991752 - ESTERASE FREE ENZYMES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.05.2006
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.05.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.06.2006  [2006/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SANDOZ AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4002 Basel / CH
[2004/41]
Former [2004/30]For all designated states
Sandoz GmbH
Biochemiestrasse 10
6250 Kundl / AT
Former [2004/29]For all designated states
Sandoz GmbH
Biochemiestrasse 10
6250 Kundl / AT
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
BIOCHEMIE GESELLSCHAFT M.B.H.
6250 Kundi / AT
Inventor(s)01 / REICHERT, Arno
Leopoldstrasse 37
A-6020 Innsbruck / AT
02 / RIETHORST, Waander
Dorf 463
A-6252 Breitenbach a. Inn / AT
03 / KNAUSEDER, Franz
Oberndorf 306
A-6322 Kirchbichl / AT
04 / PALMA, Norbert
Kleinsoell 127
A-6252 Breitenbach a. Inn / AT
[2000/25]
Former [2000/15]01 / REICHERT, Arno
Postgasse 56
A-6240 Rattenberg / AT
02 / RIETHORST, Waander
Dorf 463
A-6252 Breitenbach a. Inn / AT
03 / KNAUSEDER, Franz
Oberndorf 306
A-6322 Kirchbichl / AT
04 / PALMA, Norbert
Kleinsoell 127
A-6252 Breitenbach a. Inn / AT
Representative(s)de Weerd, Petrus G.W. , et al
Novartis International AG
Corporate Intellectual Property
4002 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2005/12]de Weerd, Petrus G.W. , et al
Novartis International AG Corporate Intellectual Property
4002 Basel / CH
Former [2003/20]Grubb, Philip William , et al
Novartis AG, Corporate Intellectual Property, Lichtstrasse 35
4002 Basel / CH
Former [2000/15]Becker, Konrad
Novartis AG Patent- und Markenabteilung CH Lichtstrasse 35
4002 Basel / CH
Application number, filing date98951368.408.09.1998
[2000/15]
WO1998EP05729
Priority number, dateAT1997000150509.09.1997         Original published format: AT 150597
AT1997000150609.09.1997         Original published format: AT 150697
AT1997000150709.09.1997         Original published format: AT 150797
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9913058
Date:18.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/11]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0991752
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.1999
[2000/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.06.1999
ClassificationInternational:C12N9/06, C12P35/00, C12N9/80, C12N11/00
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/15]
TitleGerman:ESTERASE FREIE ENZYME[2005/32]
English:ESTERASE FREE ENZYMES[2000/15]
French:ENZYMES EXEMPTES D'ESTERASE[2000/15]
Former [2000/15]ESTERASE FREIE ENZYMEN
Entry into regional phase11.02.2000National basic fee paid 
11.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
11.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.03.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/15]
12.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.07.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.12.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/24]
16.01.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2006/24]
Divisional application(s)EP03011041.5  / EP1352968
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
08.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
06.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
30.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
30.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200508   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[YX]EP0601996  (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [Y] 1,2 * column 2 * [X] 13;
 [YX]GB2275925  (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [Y] 1,2 * claim - * [X] 13;
 [YX]EP0436355  (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]) [Y] 1,3 * claim - * [X] 13;
 [YX]EP0496993  (ANTIBIOTICOS SPA [IT]) [Y] 1,3 * page 5 - page 7 * [X] 13;
 [X]EP0473008  (RECORDATI CHEM PHARM [CH]) [X] 12,13 * claim - *;
 [Y]EP0243167  (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [Y] 1-3 * claim - *