Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0944937 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0944937



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1164
18.07.2007 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
17.07.2007 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 20
25.06.2007 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 5
22.05.2007 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.05.2007 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
18.05.2007 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.05.2007 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
09.05.2007 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 2
01.03.2007 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.02.2007 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
23.02.2007 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
05.02.2007 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
03.02.2007 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
29.01.2007 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
26.01.2007 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.01.2007 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
25.01.2007 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 2
22.01.2007 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
20.01.2007 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
19.01.2007 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
18.01.2007 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
16.01.2007 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
15.01.2007 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
13.01.2007 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
11.01.2007 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 13
09.01.2007 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
13.12.2006 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
07.12.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
18.01.2006 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.01.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
04.10.2005 Change of composition of the board (except boards 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
27.09.2005 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
23.09.2005 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 51
22.09.2005 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 52
15.07.2005 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 2
15.07.2005 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 2
08.07.2005 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
01.07.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.07.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
30.06.2005 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
25.06.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
22.06.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
02.06.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.05.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
19.05.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.05.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
14.05.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
14.05.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.05.2005 Annex to a communication Opposition 19
12.05.2005 Annex to a communication Opposition 26
12.05.2005 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
12.05.2005 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 16
12.05.2005 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
12.05.2005 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
12.05.2005 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
12.05.2005 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
12.05.2005 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
12.05.2005 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.05.2005 Text intended for grant Opposition 19
13.04.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.04.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
08.04.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
22.03.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.03.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.03.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
14.03.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
14.03.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 9
12.03.2005 Claims Opposition 6
12.03.2005 Claims Opposition 6
12.03.2005 Claims Opposition 1
12.03.2005 Description Opposition 2
12.03.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
12.03.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 13
11.03.2005 Claims Opposition 1
11.03.2005 Claims Opposition 6
11.03.2005 Claims Opposition 6
11.03.2005 Description Opposition 2
11.03.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
11.03.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 13
09.03.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
09.03.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 9
04.03.2005 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
03.03.2005 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
25.02.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.01.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.01.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.01.2005 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
23.12.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
16.12.2004 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
11.12.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.12.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
09.12.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.12.2004 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 4
16.11.2004 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
08.10.2004 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.10.2004 Claims Opposition 6
05.10.2004 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 8
04.10.2004 Claims Opposition 6
04.10.2004 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 8
01.07.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
01.07.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.06.2004 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
24.06.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
24.06.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
16.06.2004 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
11.05.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.05.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
08.05.2004 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
07.05.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
07.05.2004 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
06.05.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.05.2004 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.05.2004 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 5
22.04.2004 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
12.08.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.08.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
02.08.2003 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 7
01.08.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
01.08.2003 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 7
18.06.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.06.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.06.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.06.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
07.06.2003 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
07.06.2003 Withdrawal of an opposition Opposition 1
06.06.2003 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
06.06.2003 Withdrawal of an opposition Opposition 1
03.02.2003 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
03.02.2003 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
03.02.2003 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
23.01.2003 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
23.12.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
23.12.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
23.12.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
23.12.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
23.12.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
23.12.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
23.12.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
23.12.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
23.12.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
23.12.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
23.12.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
23.12.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
23.12.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
23.12.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
23.12.2002 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
23.12.2002 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
23.12.2002 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
23.12.2002 Notice of opposition Opposition 9
16.10.2002 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 22
02.09.2002 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
22.08.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
22.08.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
22.08.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.08.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
22.08.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
22.08.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
22.08.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
22.08.2002 Notice of opposition Opposition 41
22.08.2002 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
22.08.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
22.08.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
22.08.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.08.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
22.08.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
22.08.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
22.08.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
22.08.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 38
22.08.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
14.02.2002 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
22.01.2002 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
16.01.2002 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
05.01.2002 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
05.01.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
05.01.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
17.12.2001 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
17.12.2001 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
17.12.2001 Text intended for grant Search / examination 35
10.11.2001 Claims Search / examination 4
10.11.2001 Claims Search / examination 5
10.11.2001 Description Search / examination 3
10.11.2001 Description Search / examination 3
10.11.2001 Description Search / examination 4
10.11.2001 Description Search / examination 4
10.11.2001 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
10.11.2001 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
09.11.2001 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 14
30.10.2001 Claims Search / examination 6
30.10.2001 Description Search / examination 4
30.10.2001 Description Search / examination 24
30.10.2001 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 12
30.10.2001 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 14
30.10.2001 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 12
30.10.2001 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 28
30.10.2001 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 32
30.10.2001 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 12
30.10.2001 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 12
30.10.2001 Request for accelerated examination Search / examination 12
18.08.1999 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
04.06.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
24.05.1999 Priority document Search / examination 38
24.05.1999 Priority document Search / examination 28
07.05.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
14.04.1999 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
14.04.1999 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 37