Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0944937


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
20.07.2007 Opposition rejected published on  22.08.2007  [2007/34]
19.07.2007 Change: Despatch of communication that opposition is rejected
19.07.2007 New entry: Despatch of communication that opposition is rejected
17.07.2007 New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure
22.06.2007 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
23.01.2007 Change: Date of oral proceedings
10.01.2007 Change: Date of oral proceedings
10.01.2007 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
05.10.2005 Change: Appeal number
23.09.2005 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
13.07.2005 Change: Appeal number
09.07.2005 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
10.05.2005 New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision
10.05.2005 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
11.02.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.03.2005  [2005/13]
01.12.2004 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
01.12.2004 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
26.11.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.01.2005  [2005/02]
22.11.2004 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
03.09.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.10.2004  [2004/43]
20.08.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.10.2004  [2004/41]
13.08.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.09.2004  [2004/40]
06.08.2004 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  22.09.2004  [2004/39]
16.07.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.09.2004  [2004/36]
28.04.2004 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
12.03.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.04.2004  [2004/18]
08.08.2003 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
13.06.2003 Observations of proprietor on opposition
13.06.2003 Opposition withdrawn published on  30.07.2003  [2003/31]
29.01.2003 Observations of proprietor on opposition
24.01.2003 Opposition filed published on  12.03.2003  [2003/11]
21.01.2003 Unpublished change to opponent data
30.08.2002 Opposition filed published on  16.10.2002  [2002/42]
28.08.2002 Unpublished change to opponent data
08.02.2002 (Expected) grant published on  27.03.2002  [2002/13]
25.01.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
25.01.2002 Change - divisional application(s) published on  13.03.2002  [2002/11]
11.01.2002 Communication of intention to grant
11.01.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
07.12.2001 First examination report
06.12.2001 Communication of intention to grant
30.11.2001 Change - German title published on  16.01.2002  [2002/03]
05.11.2001 Amendment by applicant
05.11.2001 Request for accelerated examination
16.10.2001 Renewal fee
16.10.2000 Renewal fee
13.08.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  29.09.1999 [1999/39]
13.08.1999 Request for examination filed published on  29.09.1999 [1999/39]
16.06.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
15.06.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
05.05.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
08.12.1998 PCT data prior to European publication