Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0944937 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP02000014 EP98951524



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2002510380Global Dossier 02.04.2002A
Priority number Date
DE19745483 15.10.1997
EP9806532 15.10.1998
DE19825160 05.06.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1244187Global Dossier 25.09.2002A1
Priority number Date
DE19745483 15.10.1997
DE19825160 05.06.1998
EP98951524 15.10.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0944937Global Dossier 27.03.2002B1
EP0944937 29.09.1999A1
Priority number Date
DE19745483 15.10.1997
EP9806532 15.10.1998
DE19825160 05.06.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT215273T 15.04.2002T
Priority number Date
DE19745483 15.10.1997
EP9806532 15.10.1998
DE19825160 05.06.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU9750498 03.05.1999A
Priority number Date
DE19745483 15.10.1997
EP9806532 15.10.1998
DE19825160 05.06.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CH0944937H 15.01.2016H2
Priority number Date
DE19745483 15.10.1997
EP9806532 15.10.1998
DE19825160 05.06.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE19926481 12.09.2013B4
DE19926481 14.12.2000A1
Priority number Date
DE19926481 10.06.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE29824642U 10.01.2002U1
Priority number Date
DE19745483 15.10.1997
DE29824642 15.10.1998
DE19825160 05.06.1998
EP98951524 15.10.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE59803508 04.10.2018C5
DE59803508D 02.05.2002D1
Priority number Date
DE19745483 15.10.1997
EP9806532 15.10.1998
DE59803508 15.10.1998
DE19825160 05.06.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK0944937T 22.07.2002T3
Priority number Date
DE19745483 15.10.1997
EP9806532 15.10.1998
DE19825160 05.06.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6230542 15.05.2001B1
Priority number Date
DE19926481 10.06.1999
US31990899 10.08.1999
US44818799 23.11.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6276186 21.08.2001B1
Priority number Date
DE19745483 15.10.1997
EP9806532 15.10.1998
DE19825160 05.06.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6401515 11.06.2002B2
US2001027676 11.10.2001A1
Priority number Date
DE19745483 15.10.1997
US31990899 10.08.1999
EP9806532 15.10.1998
US87628801 06.06.2001
DE19825160 05.06.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6532790 18.03.2003B2
US2001007202 12.07.2001A1
Priority number Date
DE19926481 10.06.1999
US77431501 31.01.2001
US44818799 23.11.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9919947Global Dossier 22.04.1999A1
Priority number Date
DE19745483 15.10.1997
DE19825160 05.06.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE19825160 22.04.1999A1
Priority number Date
DE19745483 15.10.1997
DE19825160 05.06.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2172224T 16.09.2002T3
Priority number Date
DE19745483 15.10.1997
DE19825160 05.06.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PT944937E 31.07.2002E
Priority number Date
DE19745483 15.10.1997
DE19825160 05.06.1998
TypeType Divisional application
 EP1244187