Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0944937

Designated contracting states ATLapse: 15.10.2003
 BE 
 CH 
CYLapse: 31.10.2003
 DE 
 DK 
 ES 
 FILapse: 15.10.2003
 FR 
 GB 
 GRLapse: 04.05.2004
 IE 
 IT 
 LI 
 LULapse: 15.10.2003
 MCLapse: 31.10.2003
 NL 
 PTLapse: 30.04.2004
 SE 
Examination procedure16.01.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
Entry into regional phase04.06.1999National basic fee paid 
04.06.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
04.06.1999Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
05.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
European patent granted27.03.2002
Opposition procedure17.07.2007Date of despatch of rejection of opposition 
Appeal following opposition30.06.2005APPEAL FILED
22.09.2005APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED
19.06.2007APPEAL RESULT
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:29.09.1999 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:29.09.1999 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19990604
 
Event date:01.01.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB IF02
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01
 
Event date:16.01.2002 
Event description:TITLE (CORRECTION)
Free Format Text:HYDRAULIC PRESSING DEVICE
 
Event date:23.01.2002 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20011217
 
Event date:27.03.2002 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:27.03.2002 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:215273
Country of Ref Document:AT
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20020415
Kind Code of Ref Document:T
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:28.03.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI
 
Event date:02.05.2002 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:59803508
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20020502
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:15.05.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
Free Format Text:GERMAN
 
Event date:14.06.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH NV
Code Expl.: NEW AGENT
Representatives Name:R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE
 
Event date:22.07.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK T3
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS
 
Event date:24.07.2002 
Event description:GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)
Effective DATE:20020628
 
Event date:26.07.2002 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:31.07.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PT SC4A
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE
Free Format Text:AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION
Effective DATE:20020509
 
Event date:06.09.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GR EP 20020401849 GR
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE
 
Event date:06.09.2002 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Payment DATE:20020906
Year of Fee Payment:05
 
Event date:06.09.2002 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MC
Payment DATE:20020906
Year of Fee Payment:05
 
Event date:06.09.2002 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Payment DATE:20020906
Year of Fee Payment:05
 
Event date:10.09.2002 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Payment DATE:20020910
Year of Fee Payment:05
 
Event date:16.09.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2172224 ES T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:03.10.2002 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Payment DATE:20021003
Year of Fee Payment:05
 
Event date:16.10.2002 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:ROTHENBERGER WERKZEUGE AG
Effective DATE:20020822
 
Event date:24.10.2002 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Payment DATE:20021024
Year of Fee Payment:05
 
Event date:31.10.2002 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CY
Payment DATE:20021031
Year of Fee Payment:05
 
Event date:02.12.2002 
Event description:NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO
Opponent Name:ROTHENBERGER WERKZEUGE AG
 
Event date:12.03.2003 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:ROTHENBERGER WERKZEUGE AG
Effective DATE:20020822
 
Event date:12.03.2003 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:DUBUIS, SOCIETE ANONYME
Effective DATE:20021223
 
Event date:01.05.2003 
Event description:NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO
Opponent Name:ROTHENBERGER WERKZEUGE AG
 
Event date:01.05.2003 
Event description:NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO
Opponent Name:DUBUIS, SOCIETE ANONYME
 
Event date:15.10.2003 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20031015
 
Event date:15.10.2003 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20031015
 
Event date:15.10.2003 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20031015
 
Event date:31.10.2003 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CY
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20031031
 
Event date:31.10.2003 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MC
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20031031
 
Event date:30.04.2004 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20040430
 
Event date:04.05.2004 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20040504
 
Event date:30.07.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PT MM4A
Code Expl.:-ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT
Free Format Text:LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES
Effective DATE:20040430
 
Event date:22.08.2007 
Event description:OPPOSITION REJECTED
Effective DATE:20070619
 
Event date:01.11.2007 
Event description:NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION
Effective DATE:20070619
 
Event date:07.02.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R008 59803508 DE
Code Expl.: CASE PENDING AT FEDERAL PATENT COURT
 
Event date:16.05.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R039 59803508 DE
Code Expl.:-REVOCATION ACTION FILED
Effective DATE:20130207
 
Event date:12.10.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:15.01.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH AEN
Code Expl.: MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT
Free Format Text:TEILNICHTIGKEIT H2
 
Event date:12.10.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:21.03.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R043 59803508 DE
Code Expl.:-PATENT'S REVOCATION IN PART NOW FINAL
 
Event date:13.10.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.11.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Payment DATE:20170914
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.01.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20171016
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.01.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20171013
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.01.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Payment DATE:20171017
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:28.02.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20171013
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:28.02.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20171123
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:28.02.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20171013
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:28.02.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20171025
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:28.02.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Payment DATE:20171013
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:28.02.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:20171018
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:28.02.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:20171012
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:04.10.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R206 59803508 DE
Code Expl.:+AMENDED PATENT SPECIFICATION
 
Event date:15.10.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R071 59803508 DE
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY OF RIGHT
 
Event date:17.10.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL MK
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT
Effective DATE:20181014
 
Event date:22.10.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK EUP
Code Expl.:-EP PATENT EXPIRED
Effective DATE:20181015
 
Event date:07.11.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB PE20
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS
Expiry DATE:20181014
 
Event date:28.11.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE MK9A
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED
 
Event date:04.12.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE EUG
Code Expl.:-EP PATENT HAS LAPSED
 
Event date:05.12.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG BE MK
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT
Effective DATE:20181015
 
Event date:31.01.2019 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20181015
 
Event date:28.02.2019 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20181014