Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0944937

EP0944937 - HYDRAULIC PRESSING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1999/39]HYDRAULIC PRESSING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING THE SAME
[2002/03]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  20.07.2007
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.07.2007Opposition rejectedpublished on 22.08.2007  [2007/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gustav Klauke GmbH
Auf dem Knapp 46
42855 Remscheid / DE
[1999/39]
Inventor(s)01 / FRENKEN, Egbert
Sittarder Strasse 6a
D-52525 Heinsberg / DE
[1999/39]
Representative(s)Müller, Enno
Rieder & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt
Corneliusstrasse 45
42329 Wuppertal / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/39]Müller, Enno, Dipl.-Ing.
Rieder & Partner Anwaltskanzlei Corneliusstrasse 45
42329 Wuppertal / DE
Application number, filing date98951524.215.10.1998
[1999/39]
WO1998EP06532
Priority number, dateDE199714548315.10.1997         Original published format: DE 19745483
DE199812516005.06.1998         Original published format: DE 19825160
[1999/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9919947
Date:22.04.1999
Language:DE
[1999/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0944937
Date:29.09.1999
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.1999
[1999/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0944937
Date:27.03.2002
Language:DE
[2002/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.04.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01R43/042, B25B27/14
[1999/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/39]
TitleGerman:HYDRAULISCHES PRESSGERÄT[2002/03]
English:HYDRAULIC PRESSING DEVICE[2002/03]
French:DISPOSITIF DE PRESSAGE HYDRAULIQUE[2002/03]
Former [1999/39]HYDRAULISCHES PRESSGERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN DESSELBEN
Former [1999/39]HYDRAULIC PRESSING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING THE SAME
Former [1999/39]DISPOSITIF DE PRESSAGE HYDRAULIQUE ET SON PROCEDE DE FONCTIONNEMENT
Entry into regional phase04.06.1999National basic fee paid 
04.06.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
04.06.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.06.1999Examination requested  [1999/39]
30.10.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.10.2001Request for accelerated examination filed
17.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
17.12.2001Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
04.01.2002Fee for grant paid
04.01.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.01.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)EP02000014.7  / EP1244187
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  22.08.2002  06.06.2003  WITHDRAWN
Rothenberger Werkzeuge AG
Industriestrasse 7
65779 Kelkheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Zapfe, Hans
Patentanwalt
Postfach 20 01 51
63136 Heusenstamm / DE
 02  23.12.2002  21.01.2003  ADMISSIBLE
DUBUIS, société anonyme
17 rue Jules Berthonneau Z.I. de Villebarou, B.P. 3406
41034 BLOIS Cedex / FR
Opponent's representative
Chambon, Gérard
Cabinet CHAMBON 16 Boulevard d'Ormesson
95880 Enghien-les-Bains / FR
 [N/P]
Former [2003/31]
Opponent(s)01  22.08.2002  06.06.2003  WITHDRAWN
Rothenberger Werkzeuge AG
Industriestrasse 7
65779 Kelkheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Zapfe, Hans, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwalt, Postfach 20 01 51
63136 Heusenstamm / DE
 02  23.12.2002  21.01.2003  ADMISSIBLE
DUBUIS, société anonyme
17 rue Jules Berthonneau, Z.I. de Villebarou, B.P. 3406
41034 BLOIS Cedex / FR
Opponent's representative
Chambon, Gérard
Cabinet CHAMBON 16 Boulevard d'Ormesson
95880 Enghien-les-Bains / FR
Former [2003/11]
Opponent(s)01  22.08.2002  04.09.2002  ADMISSIBLE
Rothenberger Werkzeuge AG
Industriestrasse 7
65779 Kelkheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Zapfe, Hans, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwalt, Postfach 20 01 51
63136 Heusenstamm / DE
 02  23.12.2002  21.01.2003  ADMISSIBLE
DUBUIS, société anonyme
17 rue Jules Berthonneau, Z.I. de Villebarou, B.P. 3406
41034 BLOIS Cedex / FR
Opponent's representative
Chambon, Gérard
Cabinet CHAMBON 16 Boulevard d'Ormesson
95880 Enghien-les-Bains / FR
Former [2002/42]
Opponent(s)01  22.08.2002  04.09.2002  ADMISSIBLE
Rothenberger Werkzeuge AG
Industriestrasse 7
65779 Kelkheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Zapfe, Hans, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwalt, Postfach 20 01 51
63136 Heusenstamm / DE
03.02.2003Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
01.08.2003Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
11.11.2004Date of oral proceedings
25.11.2004Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
12.04.2005Date of oral proceedings
12.05.2005Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
12.05.2005Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
19.06.2007Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2007/34]
17.07.2007Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition30.06.2005Appeal received No.  T0861/05
22.09.2005Statement of grounds filed
19.06.2007Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in unamended form
19.06.2007Date of oral proceedings
25.06.2007Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
05.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT15.10.2003
FI15.10.2003
LU15.10.2003
CY31.10.2003
MC31.10.2003
PT30.04.2004
GR04.05.2004
[2005/13]
Former [2005/02]AT15.10.2003
FI15.10.2003
LU15.10.2003
CY31.10.2003
MC31.10.2003
GR04.05.2004
Former [2004/43]AT15.10.2003
FI15.10.2003
LU15.10.2003
CY31.10.2003
GR04.05.2004
Former [2004/41]FI15.10.2003
LU15.10.2003
CY31.10.2003
GR04.05.2004
Former [2004/40]FI15.10.2003
LU15.10.2003
CY31.10.2003
Former [2004/39]LU15.10.2003
CY31.10.2003
Former [2004/36]CY31.10.2003
LU31.10.2003
Former [2004/18]LU31.10.2003
Cited inInternational search[X]US2254613  (MATTHYSSE) [X] 1-6 * page 4, column L, lines 1-3; figure 4 *;
 [A]US5195354  (YASUI TADASHI ET AL) [A] 1-3 * figure 5 *