Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1032995

EP1032995 - BROADCAST NETWORK SELECTION TECHNIQUES FOR HYBRID RADIOCOMMUNICATION SYSTEMS COMPRISING BOTH A CELLULAR COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND A RADIO BROADCAST SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  15.01.2010
Database last updated on 18.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.01.2010Refusal of applicationpublished on 17.02.2010  [2010/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2004/18]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
16483 Stockholm / SE
Former [2000/36]For all designated states
TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET L M ERICSSON (publ)
126 25 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / MALMGREN, Göran
Gösta Ekmansväg 5, 5 tr
S-129 35 Hägersten / SE
[2000/36]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/36]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date98951884.027.10.1998
[2000/36]
WO1998SE01941
Priority number, dateUS1997096812217.11.1997         Original published format: US 968122
[2000/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9926367
Date:27.05.1999
Language:EN
[1999/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1032995
Date:06.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.1999
[2000/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.05.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04H1/00, H04H3/00
[2000/36]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/36]
TitleGerman:RUNDFUNKNETZAUSWAHLTECHNIK FÜR EIN HYBRIDES FUNKKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM MIT EINEM ZELLULAREN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM UND EINEM RUNDFUNKSYSTEM[2000/36]
English:BROADCAST NETWORK SELECTION TECHNIQUES FOR HYBRID RADIOCOMMUNICATION SYSTEMS COMPRISING BOTH A CELLULAR COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND A RADIO BROADCAST SYSTEM[2000/36]
French:TECHNIQUES DE SELECTION DE RESEAU DE RADIODIFFUSION POUR SYSTEMES DE RADIOCOMMUNICATION HYBRIDES COMPRENANT A LA FOIS UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION CELLULAIRE ET UN SYSTEME DE RADIODIFFUSION[2000/36]
Entry into regional phase15.05.2000National basic fee paid 
15.05.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
15.05.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.06.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
15.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
13.10.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.04.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.09.2009Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.12.2009
02.10.2009Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/07]
12.10.2009Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/07]
03.12.2009Date of oral proceedings
03.12.2009Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
22.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
21.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
23.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
25.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
15.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
27.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
29.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200508   M06   Fee paid on   15.12.2005
31.10.200912   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9715159  (CELLULAR TELECOM LTD [US]) [A] 1,12 * page 1, line 1 - page 20, line 18; figure 1; claims 1,37,38 *;
 [A]WO9628904  (BELL ATLANTIC NETWORK SERVICES [US]) [A] 1,12 * page 10, line 6 - page 13, line 11; figure 4; claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0565470  (FRANCE TELECOM [FR], et al) [A] 1,2,12 * page 2, line 1 - page 6, line 53; figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]WO9702670  (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) [A] 1,2,12 * page 1, line 1 - line 7; claim 1 * * page 7, line 31 - page 8, line 33 *;
 [A]DE19630195  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,12 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 33; figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0689307  (NOKIA TECHNOLOGY GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,12 * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 40; figures 2-4; claim 1 *
Examination EP0459360