Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1032598

EP1032598 - A PROCESS FOR THE REDUCTION OF REACTOR FOULING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.12.2004
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.06.2008Change - applicantpublished on 23.07.2008  [2008/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19898 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/30]For all designated states
E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY
1007 Market Street
Wilmington DE 19898 / US
Former [2004/19]For all designated states
E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington Del. 19898 / US
Former [2000/36]For all designated states
BOREALIS A/S
Lyngby Hovedgade 96
2800 Lyngby / DK
Inventor(s)01 / GUSTAFSSON, Bill
Dragonvägen 8
S-444 41 Stenungsund / SE
02 / DAMMERT, Ruth
Smyckegatan 50
S-426 50 Västra Frölunda / SE
03 / LAURELL, Jussi
Västanvägen 8C 15
FIN-06400 Borga / FI
04 / VAN PRAET, Erik
Spekstraat 14
B-3020 Veltem-Beisem / BE
[2000/36]
Representative(s)Wiklund, Erik , et al
AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117
200 71 Malmö / SE
[2000/36]
Application number, filing date98951892.328.10.1998
[2000/36]
WO1998SE01949
Priority number, dateSE1997000421718.11.1997         Original published format: SE 9704217
[2000/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9925742
Date:27.05.1999
Language:EN
[1999/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1032598
Date:06.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.1999
[2000/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1032598
Date:18.02.2004
Language:EN
[2004/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE27.05.1999
ClassificationInternational:C08F2/00, C08F10/02
[2000/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/36]
TitleGerman:EIN VERFAHREN ZUR VERRINGERUNG VON REAKTORVERSCHMUTZUNG[2000/36]
English:A PROCESS FOR THE REDUCTION OF REACTOR FOULING[2000/36]
French:REDUCTION DE L'ENCRASSEMENT DES REACTEURS[2000/36]
Entry into regional phase13.08.1999National basic fee paid 
13.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
13.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.05.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
13.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/36]
29.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.11.2003Fee for grant paid
25.11.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.11.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
11.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
15.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
14.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT18.02.2004
CH18.02.2004
CY18.02.2004
FI18.02.2004
IT18.02.2004
LI18.02.2004
DK18.05.2004
GR18.05.2004
SE18.05.2004
PT18.07.2004
IE28.10.2004
LU28.10.2004
MC31.10.2004
[2008/16]
Former [2007/18]AT18.02.2004
CH18.02.2004
CY18.02.2004
FI18.02.2004
LI18.02.2004
DK18.05.2004
GR18.05.2004
SE18.05.2004
IE28.10.2004
LU28.10.2004
MC31.10.2004
Former [2006/13]AT18.02.2004
CH18.02.2004
FI18.02.2004
LI18.02.2004
DK18.05.2004
GR18.05.2004
SE18.05.2004
IE28.10.2004
MC31.10.2004
Former [2005/45]AT18.02.2004
CH18.02.2004
FI18.02.2004
LI18.02.2004
DK18.05.2004
GR18.05.2004
SE18.05.2004
MC31.10.2004
Former [2005/02]AT18.02.2004
CH18.02.2004
FI18.02.2004
LI18.02.2004
DK18.05.2004
GR18.05.2004
SE18.05.2004
Former [2004/44]AT18.02.2004
CH18.02.2004
FI18.02.2004
LI18.02.2004
GR18.05.2004
SE18.05.2004
Former [2004/43]AT18.02.2004
FI18.02.2004
GR18.05.2004
SE18.05.2004
Former [2004/41]FI18.02.2004
GR18.05.2004
SE18.05.2004
Former [2004/40]FI18.02.2004
SE18.05.2004
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0460936  (DU PONT [US]);
 [A]EP0535230  (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US], et al);
 [A]US4970278  (KOMABASHIRI TAKAMICHI [JP], et al)