Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1042070

EP1042070 - CRUSHER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.03.2003
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sandvik SRP AB
233 81 Svedala / SE
[2002/13]
Former [2000/41]For all designated states
SVEDALA-ARBRA AB
233 81 Svedala / SE
Inventor(s)01 / THYSELL, Urban
Tenngjutaregatan 8
S-271 39 Ystad / SE
[2000/41]
Representative(s)Bjerre, Nils Birger Johannes
AWAPATENT AB, P.O. Box 5117
200 71 Malmö / SE
[N/P]
Former [2000/41]Bjerre, Nils B.J.
AWAPATENT AB, P.O. Box 5117
200 71 Malmö / SE
Application number, filing date98951897.229.10.1998
[2000/41]
WO1998SE01956
Priority number, dateSE1997000396730.10.1997         Original published format: SE 9703967
[2000/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9922869
Date:14.05.1999
Language:EN
[1999/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1042070
Date:11.10.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.1999
[2000/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1042070
Date:02.05.2002
Language:EN
[2002/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE14.05.1999
ClassificationInternational:B02C2/04
[2000/41]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   SE [2000/41]
TitleGerman:ZERKLEINERER[2000/41]
English:CRUSHER[2000/41]
French:BROYEUR[2000/41]
Entry into regional phase29.05.2000National basic fee paid 
29.05.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
29.05.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.05.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
29.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/41]
12.06.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
08.10.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
26.10.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.01.2002Fee for grant paid
17.01.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.02.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
05.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.05.2002
CH02.05.2002
IT02.05.2002
LI02.05.2002
DK02.08.2002
SE02.08.2002
[2008/16]
Former [2003/46]AT02.05.2002
CH02.05.2002
LI02.05.2002
DK02.08.2002
SE02.08.2002
Former [2003/16]AT02.05.2002
CH02.05.2002
LI02.05.2002
SE02.08.2002
Former [2003/10]AT02.05.2002
SE02.08.2002
Former [2002/46]SE02.08.2002
Cited inInternational search[A]US4084756  (COXHILL MAJOR)