Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1019987

EP1019987 - CORROSION-RESISTANT CONDUCTIVE CONNECTOR SHELL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.03.2005
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.03.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.05.2005  [2005/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hirel Connectors Inc.
760 West Wharton Drive
Claremont, CA 91711 / US
[2000/29]
Inventor(s)01 / BAUMANN, Frederick, B., B.
3454 N. Mills
Claremont, CA 91711 / US
[2000/29]
Representative(s)Price, Nigel John King , et al
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/29]Price, Nigel John King , et al
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date98952007.701.10.1998
[2000/29]
WO1998US20569
Priority number, dateUS1997094380103.10.1997         Original published format: US 943801
[2000/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9918635
Date:15.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1019987
Date:19.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.1999
[2000/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.04.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/533, C25D11/18
[2000/29]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/29]
TitleGerman:KORROSIONSBESTÄNDIGES, LEITENDES VERBINDERGEHÄUSE[2000/29]
English:CORROSION-RESISTANT CONDUCTIVE CONNECTOR SHELL[2000/29]
French:DOUILLE DE CONNECTEUR ELECTROCONDUCTRICE ET RESISTANT A LA CORROSION[2000/29]
Entry into regional phase02.05.2000National basic fee paid 
02.05.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
02.05.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.04.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
02.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/30]
23.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.11.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/19]
10.12.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
28.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
21.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
23.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200104   M06   Fee paid on   28.01.2002
31.10.200407   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[Y]US3683331  (OVERHOLSER JOHN S) [Y] 1,2,4,7-10,13,15,17,18,22,23 * abstract *;
 [Y]US4968389  (SATOH KAZUAKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1,2,4,7-10,13,15,17,18,22,23 * abstract *;
 [A]WO9103583  (ALCAN INT LTD [CA]) [A] 1,4,7,13,17 * abstract *