blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1020066 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1020066



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 184
18.11.2009 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
01.04.2009 Closing of application Search / examination 2
16.01.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
31.12.2008 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
23.12.2008 Annex to a communication Search / examination 2
23.12.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
23.12.2008 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
23.12.2008 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
23.12.2008 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 5
23.12.2008 Means of redress Search / examination 2
23.12.2008 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
23.12.2008 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
23.12.2008 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
23.12.2008 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
01.12.2008 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 1
26.11.2008 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
26.11.2008 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 1
26.09.2008 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 2
17.09.2008 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
12.09.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
12.09.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
04.09.2008 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
03.08.2007 Claims Search / examination 2
03.08.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
27.07.2007 Claims Search / examination 2
27.07.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
25.06.2007 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.06.2007 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
18.06.2007 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
18.06.2007 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.06.2007 Request for change of name Search / examination 3
05.06.2007 Request for change of name Search / examination 3
14.02.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
14.02.2007 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
29.08.2006 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
20.01.2006 Claims Search / examination 2
20.01.2006 Claims Search / examination 2
20.01.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
19.01.2006 Claims Search / examination 2
19.01.2006 Claims Search / examination 2
19.01.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
17.11.2005 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
11.11.2005 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.09.2005 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
09.09.2005 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
12.07.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
12.07.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
12.02.2001 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 6
12.02.2001 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 6
12.02.2001 Reply by International Bureau Search / examination 1
20.12.2000 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 2
12.12.2000 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
23.10.2000 Reply by International Bureau Search / examination 1
16.10.2000 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
11.10.2000 Reply by International Bureau Search / examination 1
11.10.2000 Reply by International Bureau Search / examination 1
25.08.2000 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
07.06.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
01.06.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
27.04.2000 Claims Search / examination 6
27.04.2000 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
27.04.2000 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
27.04.2000 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
20.05.1999 Priority document Search / examination 28
01.04.1999 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
01.04.1999 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 25