blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1020066


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
03.04.2009 Refusal of application published on  06.05.2009  [2009/19]
19.12.2008 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
19.12.2008 New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused
11.11.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.11.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.09.2008 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
23.10.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.07.2007 New entry: Reply to examination report
19.06.2007 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
15.06.2007 Change - applicant published on  18.07.2007  [2007/29]
15.06.2007 Change - representative published on  18.07.2007  [2007/29]
30.03.2007 First examination report
10.02.2007 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
12.10.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.01.2006 New entry: Reply to examination report
15.11.2005 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
18.10.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.09.2005 Change - representative published on  09.11.2005  [2005/45]
08.07.2005 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
18.10.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.10.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.10.2002 Renewal fee
18.10.2001 Renewal fee
17.10.2000 Renewal fee
02.06.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  19.07.2000 [2000/29]
02.06.2000 Request for examination filed published on  19.07.2000 [2000/29]
30.05.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
08.05.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
26.07.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
23.04.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
12.03.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
08.12.1998 PCT data prior to European publication