blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP1020066

Designated contracting statesDE 
FR 
GB 
Examination procedure23.12.2008Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Entry into regional phase27.04.2000National basic fee paid 
27.04.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
27.04.2000Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
08.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
07.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
06.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
06.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
07.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
05.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
15.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
27.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:19.07.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):DE FR GB
 
Event date:19.07.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20000427
 
Event date:02.05.2007 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20050712
 
Event date:18.07.2007 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:UNISYS PULSEPOINT COMMUNICATIONS
 
Event date:06.05.2009 
Event description:APPLICATION REFUSED
Effective DATE:20081208