Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1020066

EP1020066 - METHOD FOR CUSTOMIZING THE DIALOGUE OF A VOICE MAIL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  03.04.2009
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.04.2009Refusal of applicationpublished on 06.05.2009  [2009/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Unisys PulsePoint Communications
6307 Carpinteria Avenue
Carpinteria, CA 93013 / US
[2007/29]
Former [2000/29]For all designated states
Pulsepoint Communications
6307 Carpenteria Avenue
Carpenteria, CA 93013 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CASTAGNA, William, D.
122 Descanso Avenue
Ojai, CA 93023 / US
[2000/29]
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd
Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/29]Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
Former [2005/45]Modiano, Micaela Nadia
Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3
80469 München / DE
Former [2000/29]Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing.
Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date98952008.501.10.1998
[2000/29]
WO1998US20570
Priority number, dateUS19970060812P01.10.1997         Original published format: US 60812 P
[2000/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9917525
Date:08.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1020066
Date:19.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.1999
[2000/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.04.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04M3/50
[2000/29]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/29]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ANPASSUNG DES DIALOGS EINES SPRACHNACHRICHTENSYSTEMS[2000/29]
English:METHOD FOR CUSTOMIZING THE DIALOGUE OF A VOICE MAIL SYSTEM[2000/29]
French:PROCEDE DE PERSONNALISATION DE DIALOGUE D'UN SYSTEME DE MESSAGERIE VOCALE[2000/29]
Entry into regional phase27.04.2000National basic fee paid 
27.04.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
27.04.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.05.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
27.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/29]
12.07.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.01.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.02.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.07.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.12.2008Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/19]
08.12.2008Date of oral proceedings
23.12.2008Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/19]
23.12.2008Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
08.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
07.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
06.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
06.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
07.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
05.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
15.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
27.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
Cited inInternational search[XY]US5440615  (CACCURO JOHN A [US], et al) [X] 1,5,7,9,10,25,26,29,30 * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 10 * * column 3, lines 27-46 * * figure 8 * [Y] 6,28;
 [X]EP0420527  (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [X] 1,10,25,26,30 * abstract *;
 [Y]  - ATTWATER D J ET AL, "ISSUES IN LARGE-VOCABULARY INTERACTIVE SPEECH SYSTEMS", BT TECHNOLOGY JOURNAL, (19960101), vol. 14, no. 1, pages 177 - 186, XP000554647 [Y] 6,28 * paragraph [04.4] *
 [A]  - WESTALL F A ET AL, "SPEECH TECHNOLOGY FOR TELECOMMUNICATIONS", BT TECHNOLOGY JOURNAL, (19960101), vol. 14, no. 1, pages 9 - 27, XP000554636 [A] 1,2,14,24,26,27 * paragraph [06.4] * * paragraph [08.3] *