Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1019976

EP1019976 - SLOT LINE BAND PASS FILTER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  25.07.2003
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2003Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 10.09.2003  [2003/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ENDWAVE CORPORATION
321 Soquel Way Sunnyvale
California 94086-4102 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/03]For all designated states
Endwave Corporation
321 Soquel Way
Sunnyvale, California 94086-4102 / US
Former [2000/29]For all designated states
ENDGATE CORPORATION
321 Soquel Way
Sunnyvale, CA 94086-4102 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HENDERSON, Bert, C.
915 Lois Avenue
Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US
02 / MOHWINKEL, Clifford, A.
2362 Peachtree Lane
San Jose, CA 95128 / US
[2000/29]
Representative(s)Hackney, Nigel John , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/29]Hackney, Nigel John , et al
Mewburn Ellis, York House, 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date98952009.330.09.1998
[2000/29]
WO1998US20571
Priority number, dateUS1997094326803.10.1997         Original published format: US 943268
[2000/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9918630
Date:15.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1019976
Date:19.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.1999
[2000/29]
Search report(s)International search reportUS15.04.1999
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP06.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:H01P1/203, H01P1/201
[2001/16]
Former International [2000/29]H01P1/203
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/29]
TitleGerman:BANDPASSFILTER IN SCHLITZLEITUNGSTECHNIK[2000/29]
English:SLOT LINE BAND PASS FILTER[2000/29]
French:FILTRE PASSE-BANDE A LIGNE MICROFENTE[2000/29]
Entry into regional phase27.04.2000National basic fee paid 
27.04.2000Search fee paid 
27.04.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
27.04.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.05.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
27.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/29]
14.07.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
24.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
24.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.10.200003   M06   Fee paid on   25.10.2000
Documents cited:Search[A]DE1229659  (BOSCH ELEKTRONIK PHOTOKINO) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 *
 [A]  OSWALD J E ET AL, "THE APPLICATION OF THE FDTD METHOD TO MILLIMETER-WAVE FILTER CIRCUITS INCLUDING THE DESIGN AND ANALYSIS OF A COMPACT COPLANAR STRIP FILTER FOR THZ FREQUENCIES", IEEE MTT-S INTERNATIONAL MICROWAVE SYMPOSIUM DIGEST,US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (19940523), ISBN 0-7803-1779-3, pages 309 - 312, XP000527296 [A] 1 * figure 4 *
International search[XE]US5825263  (FALT CHRISTOPHER EDGAR [CA]);
 [AP]US5770987  (HENDERSON BERT C [US]);
 [A]US3753167  (COHN S);
 [A]  - LIN F.-L., CHIU C.-W., WU R.-B., "COPLANAR WAVEGUIDE BANDPASS FILTER A RIBBON-OF-BRICK-WALL DESIGN.", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MICROWAVE THEORY AND TECHNIQUES., IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ., US, US, (19950701), vol. 43., no. 07., doi:10.1109/22.402285, ISSN 0018-9480, pages 1589 - 1596., XP002915808

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/22.402285