Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1037719

EP1037719 - COMPOSITION AND PROCESS FOR MULTI-PURPOSE TREATMENT OF METAL SURFACES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.06.2006
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GB
published on 02.05.2007  [2007/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien
Henkelstrasse 67
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
[2005/25]
Former [2004/39]For all designated states
HENKEL CORPORATION
The Triad, Suite 200, 2200 Renaissance Boulevard
Gulph Mills, Pennsylvania 19406 / US
Former [2000/39]For all designated states
HENKEL CORPORATION
2500 Renaissance Boulevard, Suite 200
Gulph Mills, Pennsylvania 19406 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GOODREAU, Bruce, H.
11455 35 Mile Road
Romeo, MI 48065 / US
02 / PRESCOTT, Thomas, J.
1601 Brentwood
Troy, MI 48098 / US
[2000/39]
Representative(s)Gillam, Francis Cyril , et al
SANDERSON & CO.
34, East Stockwell Street
Colchester
Essex CO1 1ST / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/18]Gillam, Francis Cyril , et al
SANDERSON & CO. 34, East Stockwell Street
Colchester Essex CO1 1ST / GB
Former [2000/39]Sanderson, Laurence Andrew , et al
SANDERSON & CO. European Patent Attorneys 34, East Stockwell Street
Colchester Essex CO1 1ST / GB
Application number, filing date98952079.613.10.1998
[2000/39]
WO1998US20933
Priority number, dateUS19970062095P14.10.1997         Original published format: US 62095 P
[2000/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9919083
Date:22.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1037719
Date:27.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.1999
[2000/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1037719
Date:24.08.2005
Language:EN
[2005/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US22.04.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:B05D3/02, C23C22/36, C09D5/12
[2001/01]
Former International [2000/39]B05D3/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2000/39]
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR MEHRZWECKBEHANDLUNG VON METALLOBERFLÄCHEN[2000/39]
English:COMPOSITION AND PROCESS FOR MULTI-PURPOSE TREATMENT OF METAL SURFACES[2000/39]
French:COMPOSITION ET PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT POLYVALENT DE SURFACES METALLIQUES[2000/39]
Entry into regional phase10.05.2000National basic fee paid 
10.05.2000Search fee paid 
10.05.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
10.05.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.02.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
10.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/39]
05.01.2001Request for accelerated examination filed
07.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.02.2002Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
20.09.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
27.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.03.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.06.2005Fee for grant paid
17.06.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.05.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/31]
Request for further processing for:27.11.2002Request for further processing filed
27.11.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.12.2002Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
22.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
21.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
23.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
25.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT24.08.2005
BE24.08.2005
NL24.08.2005
GB24.11.2005
SE24.11.2005
ES05.12.2005
[2007/18]
Former [2006/25]AT24.08.2005
BE24.08.2005
NL24.08.2005
SE24.11.2005
ES05.12.2005
Former [2006/14]AT24.08.2005
NL24.08.2005
SE24.11.2005
ES05.12.2005
Former [2006/13]AT24.08.2005
SE24.11.2005
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO9607772  (HENKEL CORP [US]) [Y] 1,7,8 * claims 1-5; table 1 *;
 [Y]WO9509934  (HENKEL CORP [US]) [Y] 1,7,8 * example 10; claims 1-3 *;
 [A]DE4317217  (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [A] 1,7,8 * page 6, lines 44,45; claims 1,2,7,11 *;
 [A]WO9012902  (HENKEL CORP [US]) [A] 1,7,8 * example 1 *;
 [A]WO9704145  (HENKEL CORP [US], et al) [A] 1,7,8 * claim 1 *;
 [A]DE4412138  (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [A] 1 * claims 1-4 *;
 [A]FR2255393  (PARKER STE CONTINENTALE [FR]) [A] 1 * page 3, lines 1-4; claim 1 *;
 [A]WO9533869  (HENKEL CORP [US], et al) [A] 3 * page 7, lines 13-19; claim 1 *;
 [PA]EP0812933  (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD [JP]) [PA] 7,8 * claims 8-17 *
International search[X]US5298289  (LINDERT ANDREAS [US], et al)