EP1034233 - DIAMOND-LIKE CARBON COATINGS ON INORGANIC PHOSPHORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/37] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAVID, Moses, M. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
JOHNSON, Dee, Lynn P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2000/37] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | Meyers, Hans-Wilhelm, et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2000/37] | Meyers, Hans-Wilhelm, Dr.Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 98952130.7 | 07.10.1998 | [2000/37] | WO1998US21123 | Priority number, date | US19970978716 | 26.11.1997 Original published format: US 978716 | [2000/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9927033 | Date: | 03.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1034233 | Date: | 13.09.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1034233 | Date: | 22.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C09K11/02, B05D3/14 | [2000/37] | CPC: |
C23C16/26 (EP,US);
C09K11/025 (EP,US);
C09K11/08 (EP);
C23C16/4417 (EP,US);
Y10S428/917 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2991 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/37] | Title | German: | DIAMANTARTIGE KOHLENSTOFFBESCHICHTUNGEN AUF INORGANISCHEM PHOSPHOR | [2000/37] | English: | DIAMOND-LIKE CARBON COATINGS ON INORGANIC PHOSPHORS | [2000/37] | French: | COUCHES DE CARBONE EN FORME DE LOSANGE RECOUVRANT DES PHOSPHORES INORGANIQUES | [2000/37] | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/37] | 21.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 25.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 22.05.2002 | [2008/16] | Cited in | International search | [XP]FR2760755 (FUTABA DENSHI KOGYO KK [JP]) [XP] 1-7,12,18-22 * the whole document *; | [DX]JPH04304290 ; | [AP]WO9746484 ; | [DX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930316), vol. 017, no. 124, Database accession no. (C - 1035), & JP04304290 A 19921027 (NICHIA CHEM IND LTD) [DX] 1-4,6,12-14,16,18 * abstract * | [AP] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 98, no. 04, Database accession no. 98-042066, XP002090164 & WO9746484 A 19971211 (AMTEKH INT INC R) [AP] 12,18,22 * abstract * | [A] - CHIA-FU CHEN ET AL, "Microwave plasma chemical vapour deposition of diamond: its growth and characterization", INSPEC, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, STEVENAGE, GB, XP002090163 [A] 12,18,22 * abstract * | [ ] - 17TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON METALLURGICAL COATINGS AND 8TH INTERNATIONAL THIN FILM CONFERENCE, SAN DIEGO, CA, USA, 2-6 APRIL 1990, ISSN 0257-8972, Surface and Coatings Technology, 5 Dec. 1990, Switzerland, vol. 43-44, no. 1-3, pages 53 - 62 |