Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1034031

EP1034031 - THROAT AND CONE GAS INJECTOR AND GAS DISTRIBUTION GRID FOR SLURRY REACTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.06.2003
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.06.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.07.2003  [2003/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company
180 Park Avenue P.O. Box 390
Florham Park NJ 07932-0390 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/37]For all designated states
ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company
PO Box 390, 180 Park Avenue
Florham Park, New Jersey 07932-0390 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CHANG, Min
4 Quail Run
Warren, NJ 07059 / US
02 / COULALOGLOU, Constantine, A.
5233 BRAWNER PL
ALEXANDRIA, VA 22304 / US
03 / HSU, Edward, C.
316 Eileen Way
Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US
[2000/48]
Former [2000/45]01 / CHANG, Min
4 Quail Run
Warren, NJ 07059 / US
02 / COULALOGLOU, Constantine, A.
5233 BRWNER P1
ALEXANDRIA, VA 22304 / US
03 / HSU, Edward, C.
316 Eileen Way
Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US
Former [2000/37]01 / CHANG, Min
4 Quail Run
Warren, NJ 07059 / US
02 / COULALOGLOU, Constantine, A.
20 Coventry Road
Mendham, NJ 07945 / US
03 / HSU, Edward, C.
316 Eileen Way
Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US
Representative(s)Dew, Melvyn John
ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc.
IP Law Europe
Hermeslaan 2
1831 Machelen / BE
[N/P]
Former [2001/39]Dew, Melvyn John
ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc., Law Technology P.O. Box 105
1830 Machelen / BE
Former [2000/37]Somers, Harold Arnold
ESSO Engineering (Europe) Ltd., Patents & Licences, Mailpoint 12, Esso House, Ermyn Way
Leatherhead, Surrey KT22 8XE / GB
Application number, filing date98952273.514.10.1998
[2000/37]
WO1998US21590
Priority number, dateUS1997095513021.10.1997         Original published format: US 955130
[2000/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9920385
Date:29.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1034031
Date:13.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.1999
[2000/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1034031
Date:31.07.2002
Language:EN
[2002/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.04.1999
ClassificationInternational:B01J8/44, B01J8/22, C10G2/00
[2000/37]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2000/37]
TitleGerman:DÜSE MIT HALS UND KONUS UND GASVERTEILER FÜR SCHLAMMREAKTOREN[2000/37]
English:THROAT AND CONE GAS INJECTOR AND GAS DISTRIBUTION GRID FOR SLURRY REACTOR[2000/37]
French:INJECTEURS DE GAZ A COL ET CONE ET GRILLE DE DISTRIBUTION DE GAZ POUR REACTEUR A COMBUSTIBLE EN SUSPENSION[2000/37]
Entry into regional phase17.05.2000National basic fee paid 
17.05.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
17.05.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.04.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.05.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/37]
05.03.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.08.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.09.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
21.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
08.02.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.04.2002Fee for grant paid
22.04.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.05.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
08.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200003   M06   Fee paid on   09.01.2001
Cited inInternational search[X]DE4041976  (PETROLCHEMIE UND KRAFTSTOFFE A [DE]) [X] 1-7 * column 4, line 7 - line 68 * * column 5, line 35 - column 6, line 11 * * figures 3-5; claims 1-4 *;
 [XA]US3283413  (XAVIER MAYER FRANCIS, et al) [X] 1-3 * column 2, line 21 - line 33 * * column 5, line 32 - column 6, line 18 * * figures 2,3 * [A] 7;
 [X]US3974091  (PARKER WESLEY A, et al) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * column 3, line 57 - column 4, line 20 * * column 5, line 15 - line 25 * * column 10, line 18 - line 56 *;
 [XA]US3298793  (CHARLES MALLISON WILLIAM, et al) [X] 1-3 * column 3, line 5 - line 35 * * column 4, line 62 - column 5, line 22 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 7;
 [X]US4329526  (BAGLEY MELVIN R, et al) [X] 1-3 * column 3, line 52 - line 63 * * column 4, line 45 - line 68 * * figure 1 *;
 [E]WO9849097  (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US]) [E] 1-6 * page 21, paragraph 3 * * page 22, paragraph 2 - page 23, paragraph 2 * * figures 7,8 *