Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1017479

EP1017479 - CATALYTIC CONVERTER AND EXHAUST LINE FOR CLEANING EXHAUST EMITTED FROM A LEAN MIXTURE OPERATED COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.10.2004
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.02.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AT
published on 29.03.2006  [2006/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/28]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / NEUFERT, Ronald
Alfred-Schefczik-Strasse 3
D-96247 Michelau / DE
02 / WITZEL, Frank
Konrad-Adenauer-Strasse 16
D-96215 Lichtenfels / DE
03 / FISCHER, Stefan
Schlesier Strasse 30
D-96215 Lichtenfels / DE
[2000/28]
Representative(s)Tergau & Pohl Patentanwälte
Mögeldorfer Hauptstrasse 51
90482 Nürnberg / DE
[2003/18]
Application number, filing date98952543.103.09.1998
[2000/28]
WO1998DE02603
Priority number, dateDE199713873704.09.1997         Original published format: DE 19738737
[2000/28]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9911359
Date:11.03.1999
Language:DE
[1999/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1017479
Date:12.07.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.1999
[2000/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1017479
Date:03.12.2003
Language:DE
[2003/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.03.1999
ClassificationInternational:B01D53/94, F01N3/20
[2000/28]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/28]
TitleGerman:KATALYSATOR UND ABGASLEITUNG ZUR REINIGUNG EINES ABGASES AUS EINEM MIT LUFTÜBERSCHUSS BETRIEBENEN VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR[2000/28]
English:CATALYTIC CONVERTER AND EXHAUST LINE FOR CLEANING EXHAUST EMITTED FROM A LEAN MIXTURE OPERATED COMBUSTION ENGINE[2000/28]
French:CATALYSEUR ET LIGNE DE GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT POUR L'EPURATION DE GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT PROVENANT D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE FONCTIONNANT AVEC EXCES D'AIR[2000/28]
Entry into regional phase03.03.2000National basic fee paid 
03.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
03.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.02.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/28]
13.12.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.04.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
18.07.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.03.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.08.2003Fee for grant paid
25.08.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.09.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
21.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
16.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
30.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI03.12.2003
DK03.03.2004
ES14.03.2004
AT03.09.2004
[2006/13]
Former [2005/02]FI03.12.2003
DK03.03.2004
ES14.03.2004
Former [2004/46]FI03.12.2003
ES14.03.2004
Former [2004/26]FI03.12.2003
Cited inInternational search[DA]EP0615777  (MAN NUTZFAHRZEUGE GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1-8 * column 1, line 46 - column 2, line 48 * * column 3, line 31 - column 5, line 20; figure 2 *;
 [A]DE4417238  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-8 * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 27 * * column 3, line 44 - column 5, line 26; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0585795  (MAN NUTZFAHRZEUGE AG [DE]) [A] 2 * claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0628706  (INCO LTD [CA]) [A] 9 * claims 1,7 *