Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969783

EP0969783 - EMERGENCY SUPPORT FOR STABILISING INDIVIDUAL LIMBS OR BODY PARTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.04.2003
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.08.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 22.09.2004  [2004/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Stelzenmüller, Wolfgang
Hirtengasse 9-11
63263 Neu-Isenburg / DE
[2000/02]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Mai, Oppermann & Partner i.L.
Patentanwälte
John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4
65189 Wiesbaden / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner GbR
Patentanwälte, John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4
65189 Wiesbaden / DE
Former [2000/02]Eyer, Eckhardt Philipp, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Eyer & Linser, Robert Bosch Strasse 12a
63303 Dreieich / DE
Application number, filing date98952648.825.09.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998EP06110
Priority number, dateDE199714283328.09.1997         Original published format: DE 19742833
DE199810711220.02.1998         Original published format: DE 19807112
[2000/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9916392
Date:08.04.1999
Language:DE
[1999/14]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0969783
Date:12.01.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.1999
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0969783
Date:29.05.2002
Language:DE
[2002/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.06.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61F5/04
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/12]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:NOTFALL-STÜTZE ZUR STABILISIERUNG EINZELNER GLIEDMASSEN ODER KÖRPERPARTIEN[2000/02]
English:EMERGENCY SUPPORT FOR STABILISING INDIVIDUAL LIMBS OR BODY PARTS[2000/02]
French:ELEMENT DE SOUTIEN DE SECOURS POUR STABILISER DES PARTIES DE CORPS INDIVIDUELLES[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase15.05.1999National basic fee paid 
15.05.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
29.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/12]
18.01.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
22.05.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.05.2000Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
29.09.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.07.2001Date of oral proceedings
23.07.2001Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
31.07.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.11.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.03.2002Fee for grant paid
07.03.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.03.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
26.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
02.03.2000M01   Fee paid on   05.04.2000
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200003   M06   Fee paid on   15.01.2001
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGR29.05.2002
IE29.05.2002
DK29.08.2002
LU25.09.2002
[2004/39]
Former [2003/46]GR29.05.2002
IE29.05.2002
DK29.08.2002
Former [2003/20]GR29.05.2002
IE29.05.2002
Former [2003/17]IE29.05.2002
Cited inInternational search[X]US3745998  (ROSE F) [X] 1-3,8-9;
 [X]US3762404  (SAKITA T) [X] 1-4;
 [A]GB2171603  (NAT RES DEV) [A] 1-3;
 [A]US3397688  (MAX GOTTFRIED) [A] 1-5